Veasy et al v. Austin et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Veasy and Cloys Veasy
Defendant: Jimmy Austin, Mawson & Mawson, Inc. and Carolina Casualty Insurance Co.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02985
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 26, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nancy Veasy.(Goode, Barton)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 Initial Disclosures by Jimmy Austin, Carolina Casualty Insurance Co., Mawson & Mawson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A-Names of Witnesses Known by Defendants, #2 Exhibit Attachment B-Defendants' Statement Re Expert Testimony, #3 Exhibit Attachment C-List of Documents that May Be Used to Support Defendants' Claims, #4 Exhibit Attachment D-Defendants not making any claims for damages, #5 Exhibit Attachment E-Defendants Primary Insurance Policy will be provided)(Cheng, Tina)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials (Mawson's 1st ROGs & RPDs to Nancy Veasy; Austin's 1st ROGs and RPDs to Nancy Veasy & Mawson & Mawson, Inc.'s 1st ROGs & RPDs to Cloys Veasy by Jimmy Austin, Mawson & Mawson, Inc..(Cheng, Tina)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 First Initial Disclosures by Nancy Veasy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Attachment B, #3 Exhibit Attachment C, #4 Exhibit Attachment D, #5 Exhibit Attachment E)(Goode, Barton)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Upon review of the information contained in the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan form completed and filed by the parties, the Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified: : The parties have 8 months for discovery. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 8/5/2020. (tmf)
August 4, 2020 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons and #6 Leave of Absence read and approved by LMM. (rlb)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Carolina Casualty Insurance Co., Mawson & Mawson, Inc.. (Cheng, Tina)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): August 10, 2020 through and including September 1, 2020, October 19, 2020 through and including October 26, 2020, by Michael David Hostetter. (Hostetter, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jimmy Austin, Carolina Casualty Insurance Co., Mawson & Mawson, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent W. R. Berkley Corporation for Carolina Casualty Insurance Co.. (Cheng, Tina)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/22/2020. (tmf)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/10/2020. (rvb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand, by Jimmy Austin, Carolina Casualty Insurance Co., Mawson & Mawson, Inc. Discovery ends on 12/14/2020. (Filed in State Court on July 17, 2020)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT, filed by Jimmy Austin, Mawson & Mawson, Inc., Carolina Casualty Insurance Co. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9926444) (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Declaration of Tina Cheng, #3 Summons to Jimmy Austin, #4 Summons to Mawson & Mawson, #5 Summons to Carolina Casualty Insurance Co., #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veasy et al v. Austin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Austin
Represented By: Michael David Hostetter
Represented By: Tina Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mawson & Mawson, Inc.
Represented By: Michael David Hostetter
Represented By: Tina Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina Casualty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Michael David Hostetter
Represented By: Tina Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Veasy
Represented By: Barton Hayes Goode
Represented By: Jan Phillip Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cloys Veasy
Represented By: Barton Hayes Goode
Represented By: Jan Phillip Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?