El v. City of Doraville Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Asuma Asim Makaio El
Defendant: Brown & Brown Wrecker Services, City of Doraville Police Department, Doraville Municiple Court and Officer Saleh A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02986
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1985
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Asuma Asim Makaio El re #7 Order (jta)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court thus ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Dkt. #4 ) and DENIES Plaintiffs Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Dkt. #1 ). The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to pay the filing fee no later than September 28, 2020. If he fails to do so, this action may be dismissed for failure to comply with a lawful court order. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to submit this matter after September 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/14/2020. (jta)
September 3, 2020 Submission of #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Asuma Asim Makaio El, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jta)
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Asuma Asim Makaio El re #6 Notice (Other). (jta)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 14, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Asuma Asim Makaio El re #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (jta)
August 14, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Asuma Asim Makaio El re #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Asuma Asim Makaio El. (jta)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Report and Recommendation,, by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 8/14/2020. (jta)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING re Plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be DENIED. If the District Court adopts this recommendation, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff be advised that he must pay the filing fee within fourteen (14) days of the District Court's Order denying the Application. If Plaintiff fails to do so, this action may be dismissed for failure to comply with an Order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 8/14/2020. (jta)
August 4, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Asuma Asim Makaio El re #3 Notice (Other). (jta)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 24, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Asuma Asim Makaio El re #2 Order, and Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (jta)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Plaintiff Asuma Asim Makaio Martel El, proceeding pro se, seeks leave to file this civil action in forma pauperis without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs #1 and cannot approve it without more information. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed in forma pauperis, he is ORDERED to file a completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, or in the alternative, to pay the filing fee, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 7/24/2020. (jta)
July 20, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (tcc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Asuma Asim Makaio El. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El v. City of Doraville Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown & Brown Wrecker Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Doraville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doraville Municiple Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Saleh A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asuma Asim Makaio El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?