Lucasys Inc. v. Powerplan, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lucasys Inc.
Defendant: Powerplan, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02987
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Powerplan, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Roper Technologies, Inc. for Powerplan, Inc.. (McDaniel, Petrina)
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Powerplan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(McDaniel, Petrina)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #15 and #16 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/27/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
August 27, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Damond R. Mace Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10061055).. Attorney Damond R. Mace added appearing on behalf of Powerplan, Inc. (nmb)
August 27, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen M. Fazio Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10061019).. Attorney Stephen M. Fazio added appearing on behalf of Powerplan, Inc. (nmb)
August 24, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Damond R. Mace Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10061055).by Powerplan, Inc.. (McDaniel, Petrina) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 24, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen M. Fazio Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10061019).by Powerplan, Inc.. (McDaniel, Petrina) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, re Order on #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. No further extensions of this deadline will be granted absent exceptional circumstances. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/4/20. (hfm)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Powerplan, Inc. Answer due 9/11/2020. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/4/20. (hfm)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Lucasys Inc.. (Alloy, Jason)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (McDaniel, Petrina)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Powerplan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Petrina)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #8 , #9 , and #10 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/31/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
July 31, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Aaron Gott Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9965335).. Attorney Aaron R. Gott added appearing on behalf of Lucasys Inc. (nmb)
July 31, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Jarod Bona Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9965330).. Attorney Jarod M. Bona added appearing on behalf of Lucasys Inc. (nmb)
July 31, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Jon Cieslak Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9965314).. Attorney Jon Cieslak added appearing on behalf of Lucasys Inc. (nmb)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Aaron Gott Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9965335).by Lucasys Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Robbins, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Jarod Bona Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9965330).by Lucasys Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Robbins, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Jon Cieslak Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9965314).by Lucasys Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Robbins, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by Lucasys Inc.. (Alloy, Jason)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Alloy, Jason)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel in cases Proceeding before Judge Amy Totenberg. Parties are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/27/20. (jpa)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to PowerPlan, Inc. through its registered agent. (Alloy, Jason)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/10/20. (aaq)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Powerplan, Inc. (aaq)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lucasys Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9926506) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaq) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucasys Inc. v. Powerplan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucasys Inc.
Represented By: Jon Cieslak
Represented By: Jason S. Alloy
Represented By: Aaron R. Gott
Represented By: Jarod M. Bona
Represented By: Richard Lance Robbins
Represented By: Joseph Harris Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powerplan, Inc.
Represented By: Damond R. Mace
Represented By: Petrina Ann McDaniel
Represented By: Stephen M. Fazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?