American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc. et al v. Varsity Brands, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC doing business as Jeff and Craig Camps, Ashley Haygood, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc. and Rockstar Championships, LLC
Defendant: USA Federation for Sport Cheering doing business as USA Cheer, Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC, Herff Jones, LLC, BSN Sports, LLC, U.S. All Star Federation, Inc., Bain Capital, LP, Varsity Spirit Fashion & Supplies, LLC, Varsity Intropia Tours, LLC, Stanbury, LLC, Varsity Brands, LLC, Varsity Spirit, LLC, Jeff Webb and Varsity Brands Holding Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03088
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer filed by American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc.. (Falanga, Robert)
September 18, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee filed by American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Ashley Haygood)(Falanga, Robert)
September 17, 2020 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Pl. Rule 5.4 for RTP to Certain Def. by American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc..(Falanga, Robert)
September 17, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #39 APPLICATION for Admission of Brendan P. Gaffney Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10138887).. Attorney Brendan Patrick Gaffney added appearing on behalf of Jeff Webb (cdg)
September 17, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #38 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul E. Coggins Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10138770).. Attorney Paul Edward Coggins added appearing on behalf of Jeff Webb (cdg)
September 16, 2020 Filing 41 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc.. (Falanga, Robert)
September 14, 2020 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Persons by BSN Sports, LLC, Bain Capital, LP, Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC, Herff Jones, LLC, Stanbury, LLC, U.S. All Star Federation, Inc., USA Federation for Sport Cheering, Varsity Brands Holding Co., Inc., Varsity Brands, LLC, Varsity Intropia Tours, LLC, Varsity Spirit Fashion & Supplies, LLC, Varsity Spirit, LLC. (Carrier, Sarah)
September 14, 2020 Filing 39 APPLICATION for Admission of Brendan P. Gaffney Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10138887).by Jeff Webb. (Trevino, Talis) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 14, 2020 Filing 38 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul E. Coggins Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10138770).by Jeff Webb. (Trevino, Talis) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 11, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Talis Colgan Trevino on behalf of Jeff Webb (Trevino, Talis)
September 4, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer with Brief In Support by BSN Sports, LLC, Bain Capital, LP, Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC, Herff Jones, LLC, Stanbury, LLC, U.S. All Star Federation, Inc., USA Federation for Sport Cheering, Varsity Brands Holding Co., Inc., Varsity Brands, LLC, Varsity Intropia Tours, LLC, Varsity Spirit Fashion & Supplies, LLC, Varsity Spirit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Steven Kaiser)(Carrier, Sarah)
September 4, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee with Brief In Support by BSN Sports, LLC, Bain Capital, LP, Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC, Herff Jones, LLC, Stanbury, LLC, U.S. All Star Federation, Inc., USA Federation for Sport Cheering, Varsity Brands Holding Co., Inc., Varsity Brands, LLC, Varsity Intropia Tours, LLC, Varsity Spirit Fashion & Supplies, LLC, Varsity Spirit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Steven Kaiser, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Steve Peterson, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of John Newby, #5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Bill Seely)(Carrier, Sarah)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 28, 2020 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. U.S. All Star Federation, Inc. waiver mailed on 8/11/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Falanga, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 31, 2020 Filing 18 Electronic Summons Issued as to Varsity Spirit Fashion & Supplies, LLC. (rjs)
July 31, 2020 Filing 17 Electronic Summons Issued as to Varsity Spirit, LLC. (rjs)
July 31, 2020 Filing 16 Electronic Summons Issued as to Varsity Brands, LLC. (rjs)
July 30, 2020 Filing 15 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc. Varsity Spirit Fashions and Supplies_Summons (Falanga, Robert)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc. Varsity Spirit_Summons (Falanga, Robert)
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc. Varsity Brands_Summons (Falanga, Robert)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons by American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc.. (Falanga, Robert)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020. (adg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jeff Webb. (adg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Varsity Brands Holding Co., Inc.. (adg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Varsity Intropia Tours, LLC. (adg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to USA Federation for Sport Cheering. (adg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to U.S. All Star Federation, Inc.. (adg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Stanbury, LLC. (adg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Herff Jones, LLC. (adg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC. (adg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Bain Capital, LP. (adg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9949913) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc. et al v. Varsity Brands, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Federation for Sport Cheering doing business as USA Cheer
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herff Jones, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSN Sports, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. All Star Federation, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bain Capital, LP
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varsity Spirit Fashion & Supplies, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varsity Intropia Tours, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanbury, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varsity Brands, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varsity Spirit, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Webb
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Gaffney
Represented By: Paul Edward Coggins
Represented By: Talis Colgan Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varsity Brands Holding Co., Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC doing business as Jeff and Craig Camps
Represented By: Robert A. Falanga
Represented By: Handerson Kobelah Wellington Svensen Bennah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Haygood
Represented By: Robert A. Falanga
Represented By: Handerson Kobelah Wellington Svensen Bennah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Falanga
Represented By: Handerson Kobelah Wellington Svensen Bennah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockstar Championships, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Falanga
Represented By: Handerson Kobelah Wellington Svensen Bennah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?