Hines v. Medical Data Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Hines
Defendant: Medical Data Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03179
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tricia Anne Olson Zachary (counsel for Medical Data Systems, Inc.) re #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (tcc)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Medical Data Systems, Inc. Answer due 10/9/2020. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this order to Defendants counsel: Tricia Anne Olson Zachary, Ovaile Law Group, 5201 Eden Avenue, Suite 300, Edina, Minnesota 55436. Additionally, counsel for Plaintiff is DIRECTED to immediately provide a copy of this order to Ms. Olson Zachary by electronic mail. The Court has some concerns about granting motions that affect a represented Defendant's time to answer when defense counsel has not yet appeared in the case. if Plaintiff's counsel elects to use this procedure again in another case pending before the undersigned, he must provide the Court with the consenting counsels contact information in the motion. And there must be a return of service filed on the docket. SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 9/24/2020. (tcc)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Michael Hines. (Landreau, Matthew)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Michael Hines. Medical Data Systems, Inc. served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Landreau, Matthew)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION For Extension of Tie to Respond to Complaint by Michael Hines. (Landreau, Matthew)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Michael Hines. (Landreau, Matthew)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (eop)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Medical Data Systems, Inc.. (eop)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Michael Hines. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9973697) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hines v. Medical Data Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hines
Represented By: Matthew J Landreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Data Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?