Holt v. Woodstock Village II, LP
Plaintiff: Dakota Holt
Defendant: Woodstock Village II, LP
Case Number: 1:2020cv03221
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Disclosures by Dakota Holt. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment A, #2 Supplement Attachment C)(Ehrlich, Craig)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dakota Holt. Woodstock Village II, LP waiver mailed on 8/5/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Ehrlich, Craig)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 19, 2020 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Dakota Holt. (Ehrlich, Craig)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Woodstock Village II, LP. (eop)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dakota Holt. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9980633) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. Woodstock Village II, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodstock Village II, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota Holt
Represented By: Craig J. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?