Myers Team Management v. Brown
Plaintiff: Myers Team Management
Defendant: LaAreon Brown
Case Number: 1:2020cv03282
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Referring Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #8 Certified Copy of Order on Final Report and Recommendation and #9 Letter to Magistrate Court of Newton County, Georgia. (bdb)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 Letter to Magistrate Court of Newton County, Geoergia with #8 Order on Final Report and Recommendation remanding case back. (bdb)
September 8, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (bdb)
September 8, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to LaAreon Brown, Myers Team Management re #8 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (bdb)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER adopting #4 Final Report and Recommendation and that this action is REMANDED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) to the Magistrate Court of Newton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/8/2020. (bdb)
September 8, 2020 Docket reviewed by SDG. No conflict. (ash)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 31, 2020 Submission of #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal, filed by LaAreon Brown, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (bdb)
August 13, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to LaAreon Brown, Myers Team Management re #6 Order. (bdb)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on August 12, 2020. (ash)
August 11, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to LaAreon Brown, Myers Team Management re #5 Order for Service and #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal filed by LaAreon Brown. (bdb)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation by Judge Steven D. Grimberg. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 8/11/2020. (bdb) Modified on 8/12/2020 to correct judge (bdb).
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting ifp and FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal filed by LaAreon Brown RECOMMENDING that this action be REMANDED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) to the Magistrate Court of Newton County. As this is a final Report and Recommendation and there are no other matters pending before the Court, the Clerk is directed to terminate the reference to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 8/11/2020. (bdb)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by LaAreon Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 8/11/2020 in R&R. (bdb)
August 7, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (eop)
August 7, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to LaAreon Brown re #2 Order. (eop)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by LaAreon Brown. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers Team Management v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myers Team Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaAreon Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?