Wilson et al v. Cleveland Brothers Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeffery Wilson and Barry Wilson
Defendant: Cleveland Brothers Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03291
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Barry Wilson and Jeffery Wilson re #6 Order. (jpk)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE TO PRO SE PARTIES: Because Plaintiffs have not provided evidence that they have complied with the requirements of Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure here, and so Defendant has not yet even had an opportunity to respond, Plaintiffs' #4 Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/4/2020. (jpk)
September 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Barry Wilson, Jeffery Wilson re #5 Order. (rvb)
September 29, 2020 Submission of #4 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Cleveland Brothers Inc. to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (jpk)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Cleveland Brothers Inc. by Barry Wilson, Jeffery Wilson. (adg)
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Barry Wilson, Jeffery Wilson re #3 Notice (Other). (jpa)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 10, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Barry Wilson and Jeffery Wilson re #2 Order. (eop)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jeffery Wilson and Barry Wilson. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number GAN100123298) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. Cleveland Brothers Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland Brothers Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?