Goodrich v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp.
Plaintiff: Marilyn E. Goodrich
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03344
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Referring Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12:1452e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Submission of #7 MOTION for Extension of Time re: #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (rlb)
September 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Marilyn E. Goodrich re #8 Notice (Other). (rlb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to re: #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Marilyn E. Goodrich. (rlb)
September 10, 2020 Submission of #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #3 MOTION to Stay , to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (rlb)
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Marilyn E. Goodrich RE: #6 Order. (aaq)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit )(Krivo, Gregory) Modified on 8/20/2020 to edit event type (bnp).
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp.. (Krivo, Gregory)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Krivo, Gregory)
August 18, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Marilyn E. Goodrich re #2 Order. (rvb)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (rvb)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT, filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-10021555) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 8/14/2020 to correct filer (rvb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodrich v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn E. Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp.
Represented By: Gregory Scott Krivo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?