Simpson et al v. Headlands Residential 2019-RPLI Owner Trust et al
Plaintiff: Vesta Simpson and Norman Simpson, Sr.
Defendant: BSI Financial Services, LLC, Oksana V. Sepich, Headlands Residential 2019-RPLI Owner Trust and Najarian Capital, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03358
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: John K Larkins
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Norman Simpson, Sr., Vesta Simpson re #7 Notice (Other). (tcc)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Norman Simpson, Sr., Vesta Simpson re #6 Notice (Other). (jpa)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 20, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Norman Simpson, Sr., Vesta Simpson re #5 Order on Motion for Default Judgment. (tcc)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment is DENIED. [Doc. #2 .] Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 8/20/2020. (tcc)
August 14, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Norman Simpson, Sr., Vesta Simpson re #3 Order. (rvb)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (rvb)
August 14, 2020 Submission of #2 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (rvb)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BSI Financial Services, LLC, Headlands Residential 2019-RPLI Owner Trust, Najarian Capital, LLC, and Oksana V. Sepich. (Attachments: #1 Summons BSI Financial Services, LLC, #2 Summons Najarian Capital, LLC, #3 Summons Oksana V. Sepich) (jpk)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants, by Norman Simpson, Sr., Vesta Simpson. (rvb)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Norman Simpson, Sr., Vesta Simpson. (Filing fee $400, receipt number GAN100123424) (Attachments: #1 Affidavits of Truth, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson et al v. Headlands Residential 2019-RPLI Owner Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vesta Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Simpson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSI Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oksana V. Sepich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Headlands Residential 2019-RPLI Owner Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Najarian Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?