Gibbs v. U.S. Auto Sales, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Valerie E. Gibbs
Defendant: Ken Evans, Myron Parker and U.S. Auto Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03371
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ken Evans, U.S. Auto Sales, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent USASF National Corporation, Corporate Parent USASF Holdco LLC, Corporate Parent USASF LLC for Ken Evans, U.S. Auto Sales, Inc.. (Rajan, Anandhi)
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #6 Order, (Rajan, Anandhi)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by U.S. Auto Sales, Inc..(Rajan, Anandhi) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 9/21/2020 to correct filer information (rjs).
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ken Evans. Discovery ends on 2/16/2021.(Rajan, Anandhi) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 9/21/2020 to correct filer information (rjs).
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to Ken Evans. (Kealy, Victoria)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to U.S. Autosales, Inc.. (Kealy, Victoria)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/24/2020. (bnp)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ken Evans. (eop)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Myron Parker. (eop)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to U.S. Auto Sales, Inc.. (eop)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Valerie E. Gibbs. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10028081) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs v. U.S. Auto Sales, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Evans
Represented By: Anandhi S. Rajan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myron Parker
Represented By: Anandhi S. Rajan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Auto Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Anandhi S. Rajan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie E. Gibbs
Represented By: Heather C. Wright
Represented By: Victoria Kealy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?