Johnson v. Hill et al
Plaintiff: Andre Johnson
Defendant: Sheriff Victor Hill and Jennifer Ley
Case Number: 1:2020cv03392
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 Petition for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): November 13 and 16 2020; November 20, 2020 through November 24, 2020; December 28, 2020 through January 4, 2021; January 15, 2021 through January 19, 2021; February 12, 2021 through February 22, 2021; April 2, 2021 through April 12, 2021; May 28, 2021 through June 1, 2021; July 2, 2021 through including July 5, 2021., by Arash A. Sabzevari. (Sabzevari, Arash)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Andre Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Mathis, Tony)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION to Stay All Discovery with Brief In Support by Jennifer Ley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sabzevari, Arash)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Jennifer Ley. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Sabzevari, Arash)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) denying as moot Defendants' #4 Motion to Dismiss and #5 Motion to Stay Discovery in the light of Plaintiff's #7 Amended Complaint. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/9/2020. (bgt)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Andre Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C NOTICE OF CLAIM)(Mathis, Tony) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION to Stay All Discovery with Brief In Support by Victor Hill, Jennifer Ley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sabzevari, Arash)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Victor Hill, Jennifer Ley. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Sabzevari, Arash)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/24/2020. (bgt)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Jennifer Ley and Victor Hill. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-10032995) (Attachments: #1-CORRUPTED PDF- Exhibit -A-, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #4 -RESCANNED DOC.1-1 -Exhibit-A-) (eop). Modified on 8/19/2020 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Victor Hill
Represented By: Jack Reynolds Hancock
Represented By: Arash A. Sabzevari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Ley
Represented By: Jack Reynolds Hancock
Represented By: Arash A. Sabzevari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Johnson
Represented By: Tony E. Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?