St. Clair v. CMS Mechanical Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Daniel St. Clair
Defendant: Ares Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Bull and CMS Mechanical Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03398
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 Initial Disclosures by Daniel St. Clair.(Smith, Nicholas)
October 14, 2020 Filing 17 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Daniel St. Clair. (Smith, Nicholas)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 Defendants' ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Ares Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Bull, CMS Mechanical Services, LLC. Discovery ends on 2/11/2021.(Lowery, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Daniel St. Clair. Ares Holdings, LLC served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service Georgia)(Smith, Nicholas)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Daniel St. Clair. CMS Mechanical Services, LLC served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service for Florida)(Smith, Nicholas)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 9/17, 9/18, 9/19, 9/20, 9/21, 9/22, by Nicholas Prince Smith. (Smith, Nicholas)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/21/20. (bnw)
August 21, 2020 Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons APPROVED by JPB. (bnw)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT to correct paragraph numbering against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Daniel St. Clair.(Smith, Nicholas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ares Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Bull, CMS Mechanical Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ddm)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by Daniel St. Clair. (Smith, Nicholas)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Daniel St. Clair for Robert A. Bull (Smith, Nicholas)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Daniel St. Clair for Ares Holdings (Smith, Nicholas)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Daniel St. Clair for CMS Mechanical (Smith, Nicholas)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Daniel St. Clair Corrected (Smith, Nicholas)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Daniel St. Clair. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10033376) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Incorrect Summon(s))(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Clair v. CMS Mechanical Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ares Holdings, LLC
Represented By: John Roger Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Bull
Represented By: John Roger Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS Mechanical Services, LLC
Represented By: John Roger Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel St. Clair
Represented By: Nicholas Prince Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?