Lundy v. Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alexis Lundy
Defendant: Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03405
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Publix Super Markets, Inc..(Roth, Robyn) Modified on 10/14/2020 to edit text and remove abbreviations(jta).
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 17, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to attorney for Alexis Lundy re #12 Scheduling Order. (jta)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER APPROVING re: #8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case is assigned to a six-month discovery track. Discovery shall be completed on or before March 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/17/2020. (jta)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 First Certificate of Interested Persons by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Roth, Robyn)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 First Initial Disclosures by Publix Super Markets, Inc..(Roth, Robyn)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Publix Super Markets, Inc. by Publix Super Markets, Inc..(Roth, Robyn)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 First JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Roth, Robyn)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to E. J. Boswell. Clerk to follow-up by 9/10/2020. (nmb)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/24/2020. (bgt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Major, Gene)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. Discovery ends on 1/19/2021. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-10034338) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundy v. Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Gene A. Major
Represented By: Robyn Melanie Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Lundy
Represented By: E. J. Boswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?