Champion v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
Petitioner: Richard Champion
Respondent: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 1:2020cv03411
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Referring Judge: John K Larkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richard Champion re #7 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. (tcc)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - The Government's motion for an extension of time to respond [Doc. #6 ] is GRANTED, and the response is now due on or before October 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 10/6/2020. (tcc)
October 6, 2020 Submission of the #4 Order to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (aaq)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #4 Order Directing Clerk to Perfect Service of HC Petition, with Brief In Support by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A: Proposed Order)(Ross, Aaron)
September 29, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richard Champion re #5 Notice (Other). (ddm)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richard Champion re #3 Notice (Other). (ddm)
September 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richard Champion re #4 Order and to Federal Bureau of Prisons (via certified mail receipt # 91 7199 9991 7032 5718 1835) and USAO re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #4 Order. (ddm)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Clerk to perfect service of petition and order on respondent by certified mail, with copy to U.S. Attorney. Respondent is directed to show cause within 30 days of receipt of order why writ should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 9/2/2020. (ddm)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 24, 2020 Filing Fee Paid: $ 5.00, receipt number GAN100123606 (ddm)
August 18, 2020 Submission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (eop)
August 18, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richard Champion re #2 Order. (eop)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/17/20. (eop)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Richard Champion. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit -Letter)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champion v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Aaron Joshua Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?