Worsley v. Cobb County Adult Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Zulibeth Sarai Worsley
Defendant: Cobb County Adult Detention Center and The State of Georgia
Case Number: 1:2020cv03415
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Referring Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Zulibeth Sarai Worsley Re: #12 Clerk's Judgment and #11 Order. (aaq)
October 8, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (aaq)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing this action without prejudice. (aaq)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER adopting the #7 Final Report and Recommendation as the opinion of this Court. For the reasons stated in the R&R, the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE this action. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/08/20. (aaq)
October 5, 2020 Submission of #7 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on the #6 Amended Complaint to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpk)
September 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Zulibeth Sarai Worsley re #10 Order. (rvb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 15, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Zulibeth Sarai Worsley as to Zulibeth Sarai Worsley regarding #9 Order. (mlb)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
September 15, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Zulibeth Sarai Worsley re #7 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #8 Order. (jpk)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Service of #7 Final Report and Recommendation. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 9/14/2020. (jpk)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on the #6 Amended Complaint. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that this action be DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 9/14/2020. (jpk)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cobb County Adult Detention Center, The State of Georgia filed by Zulibeth Sarai Worsley.(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Zulibeth Sarai Worsley re #5 Notice (Other). (jpa)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 21, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Warden, Cobb County Adult Detention Center re #4 Order. (jpk)
August 21, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Zulibeth Sarai Worsley re #4 Order and 42:1983 Form. (jpk)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit an amended complaint within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the entry date of this Order. Plaintiff's #2 request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED, and plaintiff need not pay an initial partial filing fee. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: 1. The Clerk of the Court transmit a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Cobb County Adult Detention Center; 2. The Warden, or his designee, shall collect the aforesaid monthly payments from plaintiff's inmate account and remit such payments to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; 3. The Clerk of the Court shall stamp the civil action number on a standard 42 U.S.C. 1983 civil action form and forward the form to plaintiff, together with a copy of this Order, and resubmit this action to the assigned Magistrate Judge upon receipt of the amended complaint or at the expiration of the time period noted above; and 4. Service of process shall not issue until further consideration under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) of plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 8/21/2020. (Forms sent to party: 42:1983 Form) (jpk)
August 19, 2020 Submission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Zulibeth Sarai Worsley re #3 Order. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Zulibeth Sarai Worsley. (eop)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Zulibeth Sarai Worsley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worsley v. Cobb County Adult Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobb County Adult Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zulibeth Sarai Worsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?