McCray v. CR Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Coretha McCray
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Does 1 Through 100 Inclusive, CR Bard Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03419
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 50 Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Motion to Temporarily Stay Discovery with Brief In Support by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., CR Bard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Jennifer)
October 16, 2020 Filing 49 Withdrawal of Motion #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation, Does 1 Through 100 Inclusive, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., CR Bard Inc. (Moore, Jennifer)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 29, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Coretha McCray re #47 Order on Application for Admission PHV to: Steven S. Schulte. (bdb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Steven S. Schulte as to Coretha McCray. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/29/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb)
September 24, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #46 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven S. Schulte Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10166603).. Attorney Steven S. Schulte added appearing on behalf of Coretha McCray (nmb)
September 21, 2020 Filing 46 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven S. Schulte Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10166603). with Brief In Support by Coretha McCray. (Zinns, Sharon) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 3, 2020 Filing 45 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Steven S. Schulte. Clerk to follow-up by 9/14/2020. (nmb)
September 3, 2020 Filing 44 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Melissa Dorman Matthews. Clerk to follow-up by 9/14/2020. (nmb)
September 3, 2020 Filing 43 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Jordan E. Jarreau. Clerk to follow-up by 9/14/2020. (nmb)
September 3, 2020 Filing 42 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Eric Martin Przybysz. Clerk to follow-up by 9/14/2020. (nmb)
September 3, 2020 Filing 41 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Darren McDowell. Clerk to follow-up by 9/14/2020. (nmb)
September 3, 2020 Filing 40 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Allison Ng replacing attorney Jordan E. Jarreau and Melissa Dorman Matthews. (Ng, Allison)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 28, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE by Coretha McCray Certificate of Compliance (Zinns, Sharon)
August 28, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Jessica Zinns on behalf of Coretha McCray (Zinns, Sharon)
August 28, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #36 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant McKesson Corporation pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (bdb)
August 27, 2020 Filing 36 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant McKesson Corporation by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Moore, Jennifer)
August 25, 2020 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Cohen, Lori)
August 25, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori Gail Cohen on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Cohen, Lori)
August 25, 2020 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Ducca, Marcella)
August 25, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcella Coladangelo Ducca on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Ducca, Marcella)
August 25, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Brown Moore on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Moore, Jennifer)
August 24, 2020 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Moore, Jennifer)
August 24, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Brown Moore on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., CR Bard Inc (Moore, Jennifer)
August 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Coretha McCray re #28 Order to: Steven S. Schulte. (bdb)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 8/19/2020. (bdb)
August 18, 2020 Submission of #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #10 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (aar)
August 18, 2020 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02196. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #21 Motion To Sever And Transfer Venue Of Out-Of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Randy French's case be severed and transferred to the Bay City Division of the Eastern District of Michigan (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2191); b. Plaintiff Catherine Grant's case be severed and transferred to the Jackson Division of the Southern District of Mississippi (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2192); c. Plaintiff Shihee Hatchett's case be severed and transferred to the Philadelphia Division of the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2193); d. Plaintiff Karen Husky's case be severed and transferred to the Knoxville Division of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2194); e. Plaintiff James Johnson's case be severed and transferred to the Nashville Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2195); f. Plaintiff Coretha McCray's case be severed and transferred to the Atlanta Division of the Northern District of Georgia (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2196); g. Plaintiff Orion Christy's case be severed and transferred to the Orlando Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2197); h. Plaintiff Alice Pawelczyk's case is to be severed and transferred to the Harrisburg Division for the Middle District of Pennsylvania (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2198); i. Plaintiff Pamela Smith's case be severed and transferred to the Jackson Division of the Southern District of Mississippi (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2199). Plaintiff Dennis Grant is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, he shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/17/2020) (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc re: #21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation re: #21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 23 Appendix in Support filed by Orion Christy, Randy French, Catherine Grant, Dennis Grant, Shihee Hatchett, Karen Huskey, James Johnson, Coretha McCray, Alice Pawelczyk, Pamela Smith re #21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 22 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Orion Christy, Randy French, Catherine Grant, Dennis Grant, Shihee Hatchett, Karen Huskey, James Johnson, Coretha McCray, Alice Pawelczyk, Pamela Smith re #21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Orion Christy, Randy French, Catherine Grant, Dennis Grant, Shihee Hatchett, Karen Huskey, James Johnson, Coretha McCray, Alice Pawelczyk, Pamela Smith (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Orion Christy, Randy French, Catherine Grant, Dennis Grant, Shihee Hatchett, Karen Huskey, James Johnson, Coretha McCray, Alice Pawelczyk, Pamela Smith re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #17 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Orion Christy, Randy French, Catherine Grant, Dennis Grant, Shihee Hatchett, Karen Huskey, James Johnson, Coretha McCray, Alice Pawelczyk, Pamela Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before July 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Orion Christy, Randy French, Catherine Grant, Dennis Grant, Shihee Hatchett, Karen Huskey, James Johnson, Coretha McCray, Alice Pawelczyk, Pamela Smith (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. Amendment to #7 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement. . (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 9 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by CR Bard Inc. Amendment to #6 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement. . (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 8 replaced on 6/11/2020) (ykp). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened on 6/11/2020) (ykp). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CR Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened on 6/11/2020) (ykp). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Civil action number 3:20-CV-1472-G is hereby transferred to the docket of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer and shall henceforth carry the suffix letter "S". (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/9/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) Modified Docket Text on 6/8/2020 (oyh). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) Modified Docket Text on 6/8/2020 (oyh). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10896653) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - Mckesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, Inc., #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Citation Issued to McKesson Corporation, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Notice of Dismissal Hearing, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #17 Exhibit(s) D-11 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Matthews, Melissa) Modified Docket Text on 6/8/2020 (oyh). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCray v. CR Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Lori Gail Cohen
Represented By: Marcella Coladangelo Ducca
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Represented By: Jennifer Brown Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard Inc
Represented By: Lori Gail Cohen
Represented By: Marcella Coladangelo Ducca
Represented By: Allison Ng
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Represented By: Jennifer Brown Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Lori Gail Cohen
Represented By: Marcella Coladangelo Ducca
Represented By: Allison Ng
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Represented By: Jennifer Brown Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coretha McCray
Represented By: Steven S. Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steve S. Schulte
Represented By: Sharon Jessica Zinns
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?