Smith et al v. Sysco Atlanta, LLC
Plaintiff: Kenneth Smith and Kenyata Thomas
Defendant: Sysco Atlanta, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03427
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Regina D Cannon
Referring Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Service of Subpoena by Sysco Atlanta, LLC.(Knauer, Tali) Modified on 10/15/2020 to correct attorney (jpa).
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Kenneth Smith, Kenyata Thomas. (Herrington, Matthew)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter J. Stuhldreher by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on October 1, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb)
October 1, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Peter J. Stuhldreher Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Peter Justin Stuhldreher added appearing on behalf of Sysco Atlanta, LLC (cdg)
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Peter J. Stuhldreher Pro Hac Vice.by Sysco Atlanta, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of Peter J. Stuhldreher)(Knauer, Tali) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 29, 2020 Clerks Notation re #10 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 28, 2020 RETURN of #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Peter J. Stuhldreher Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10183006). to attorney for correction re: Local counsel's address. (cdg)
September 27, 2020 Filing 11 Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 9/27/20. (jpa)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sysco Atlanta, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sysco Corporation for Sysco Atlanta, LLC. (Knauer, Tali)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Sysco Atlanta, LLC. Discovery ends on 2/22/2021.(Knauer, Tali) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Peter J. Stuhldreher Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10183006).by Sysco Atlanta, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of Peter J. Stuhldreher)(Knauer, Tali) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Sysco Atlanta, LLC Answer due 9/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 9/16/2020. (jta)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Sysco Atlanta, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knauer, Tali)
September 3, 2020 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Kenneth Smith, Kenyata Thomas. (Herrington, Matthew)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS.SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sysco Atlanta, LLC. (eop) Modified on 8/20/2020 to correct date issued (eop).
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kenyata Thomas and Kenneth Smith. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10041601) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 8/20/2020 to correct date filed (eop). Modified on 8/20/2020 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Sysco Atlanta, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sysco Atlanta, LLC
Represented By: Tali Knauer
Represented By: Peter Justin Stuhldreher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Smith
Represented By: Matthew Wilson Herrington
Represented By: Charles Ronald Bridgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenyata Thomas
Represented By: Matthew Wilson Herrington
Represented By: Charles Ronald Bridgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?