Wilson v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Melliza S. Wilson
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli, Shineka Miller and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 1:2020cv03428
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (ah)
September 17, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ah)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Melliza S. Wilson (Levine, Kenneth)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Shineka Miller. (ah)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Melliza S. Wilson Request to Issue Corrected Summons for Shineka Miller, FOD (Levine, Kenneth)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 8/21/2020. (ah)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Byung J. Pak. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Shineka Miller. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kenneth Cuccinelli. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Chad Wolf. (eop)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Melliza S. Wilson. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-10041618) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shineka Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melliza S. Wilson
Represented By: Kenneth S Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?