Hiltman v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Matthew Hiltman
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv03429
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Matthew Hiltman. All Defendants. (Williams, Melanie) Modified on 9/24/2020 to edit text (jpk).
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Matthew Hiltman. (Williams, Melanie)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Matthew Hiltman. Commissioner, Social Security Administration served on 8/27/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Williams, Melanie)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commissioner, Social Security Administration filed by Matthew Hiltman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Cover Sheet)(Williams, Melanie) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(rjs)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT filed by Matthew Hiltman.(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Counsel for Plaintiff is appointed to effect service of process upon Defendant under Rule 4(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 8/24/2020. (rjs)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Second APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Matthew Hiltman. (Williams, Melanie)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Plaintiff to properly complete the application to proceed in forma pauperis in its entirety and file the completed application with the Court within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 8/21/2020. (ddm)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/20.(aaq)
August 20, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (aaq)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Matthew Hiltman. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons Proposed - US Attorney, #4 Summons Proposed - US Attorney General, #5 Summons Proposed - Office of Regional Chief Counsel)(aaq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hiltman v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Hiltman
Represented By: Melanie Nelson Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?