Ellison v. White
Petitioner: Antonio Ellison
Respondent: Warden White
Case Number: 1:2020cv03430
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Antonio Ellison re #9 Order for Service and #8 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Antonio Ellison. (bdb)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Service of #8 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 10/8/2020. (bdb)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Antonio Ellison RECOMMENDING that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to exhaust state remedies. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 10/8/2020. (bdb)
October 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Antonio Ellison re #7 Notice (Other). (bdb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 28, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Antonio Ellison at same address RE: #3 Order per directions from chambers. (aaq)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 Mail sent to Antonio Ellison, #3 Order, returned not deliverable. Marked: Return to sender, no such number, unable to forward. (aaq)
August 26, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Antonio Ellison and Warden White re #4 Order. (bdb)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis, however, Plaintiff is obligated to pay $5.00 as funds are deposited into Inmate account. The Warden or the designee shall collect the monthly payments and remit to Clerk until $5.00 is paid in full. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to transmit a copy of this Order to the warden of the institution where Petitioner is incarcerated. Service of process shall not issue pending further consideration of the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 8/26/2020. (bdb)
August 19, 2020 Submission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Antonio Ellison re #3 Order. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Antonio Ellison. (eop)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Antonio Ellison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellison v. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?