Interactive Learning Systems Inc. et al v. Minerva Capital Management Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Interactive Learning Systems Inc. doing business as Interactive College of Technology and Elmer Smith
Defendant: Jon Coover, Stanford B. Silverman, Minerva Capital Management Inc. and Minerva Inflection Strategies, LP
Case Number: 1:2020cv03433
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Derek E. Barrett re #14 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jta)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Derek E. Barrett. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 10/16/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jta)
October 16, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Derek E. Barrett Pro Hac Vice Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10262305). Attorney Derek Barrett added appearing on behalf of Minerva Capital Management Inc., Minerva Inflection Strategies, LP, Stanford B. Silverman (cdg)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Derek E. Barrett Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10262305).by Jon Coover, Minerva Capital Management Inc., Minerva Inflection Strategies, LP, Stanford B. Silverman. (Thompson, Robert) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Sheffield Thompson on behalf of Jon Coover, Minerva Capital Management Inc., Minerva Inflection Strategies, LP, Stanford B. Silverman (Thompson, Robert)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/24/2020. (bgt)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael L. Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-cv-03433-MLB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 8/21/2020. (tcc)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Interactive Learning Systems Inc. and Elmer Smith. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jon Coover. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Stanford B. Silverman. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Minerva Inflection Strategies, LP. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Minerva Capital Management Inc.. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Interactive Learning Systems Inc. and Elmer Smith. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10042711) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Interactive Learning Systems Inc. et al v. Minerva Capital Management Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Coover
Represented By: Robert Sheffield Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford B. Silverman
Represented By: Robert Sheffield Thompson
Represented By: Derek Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minerva Capital Management Inc.
Represented By: Robert Sheffield Thompson
Represented By: Derek Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minerva Inflection Strategies, LP
Represented By: Robert Sheffield Thompson
Represented By: Derek Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interactive Learning Systems Inc. doing business as Interactive College of Technology
Represented By: Robert L. Barr, Jr.
Represented By: Brannon Edward Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmer Smith
Represented By: Robert L. Barr, Jr.
Represented By: Brannon Edward Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?