Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC v. Anandani et al
Plaintiff: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC and Holiday Hospitality Franchising, Inc.
Defendant: Anita Anandani and Suresh Anandani
Case Number: 1:2020cv03436
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Discovery Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents and Request for Admissions to Defendant Anita Anandani by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC.(Slotkin, Fred)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents and Request for Admission to Defendant Suresh Anadani by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC.(Slotkin, Fred)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 Initial Disclosures by Anita Anandani, Suresh Anandani.(Tady, Aaron)
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anita Anandani, Suresh Anandani. (Tady, Aaron) Modified to edit text on 9/25/2020 (ah).
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Disclosures by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DiSanto, Rachel)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC. (DiSanto, Rachel) Modified to edit text and add corporate parents on 9/22/2020 (ah).
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC. (DiSanto, Rachel)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Rachel M. DiSanto. Clerk to follow-up by 9/14/2020. (cdg)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Anita Anandani, Suresh Anandani. Discovery ends on 1/22/2021.(Tady, Aaron) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 8/21/2020. (ah)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Suresh Anandani and Anita Anandani. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANdc-10044721) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC v. Anandani et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Fred Robert Slotkin, Jr.
Represented By: Rachel M. DiSanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, Inc.
Represented By: Fred Robert Slotkin, Jr.
Represented By: Rachel M. DiSanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Anandani
Represented By: Aaron P. M. Tady
Represented By: Thomas M. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suresh Anandani
Represented By: Aaron P. M. Tady
Represented By: Thomas M. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?