Black v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Randy L. Black
Defendant: Brian Kemp, Attorney General William Barr, USDC Judge Baverman, Congressman Doug Collins, USDC Judge Pannell, Jr., Hollinger, Warden Brown, Unknown B.O.P. Agents, USDC Judge Story, United States District Court Judges, C.O. Kemp, United States of America, C.O. Johnson, Director of B.O.P., Senator David Perdue, Senator Kelly Lafler and Mayberry
Case Number: 1:2020cv03538
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Randy L. Black re #9 Order, #10 Clerk's Judgment. (tcc)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (tcc)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
September 17, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (tcc)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The plaintiff's objections to the R&R [Doc. No. #8 ] are OVERRULED, the R&R [Doc. No. #6 ] is ADOPTED as the order and opinion of this court. The #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is denied and the #1 Complaint be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 9/16/2020. (tcc)
September 15, 2020 Submission to District Judge Charles A. Pannell Jr. re #6 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, #8 Objections to Report and Recommendation. (adg)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 OBJECTIONS to #6 Report and Recommendation filed by Randy L. Black. (adg)
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Randy L. Black re #4 Notice (Other). (jpa)
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Randy L. Black re #6 Final Report and Recommendation, #7 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (ddm)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Service of #6 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 9/2/2020. (ddm)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER (contained within #6 R&R) denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 9/2/2020. (ddm)
September 3, 2020 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (contained within #6 R&R) recommending that the #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 9/2/2020. (ddm)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the #1 Complaint be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 9/2/2020. (ddm)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 Supplement to #1 Complaint filed by Randy L. Black. (ddm)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 27, 2020 Submission of #2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis for IFP and Frivolity determination; and MOTION to Appoint Counsel, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (eop)
August 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Randy L. Black re #3 Order. (eop)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; and MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Randy L. Black. (Motions included within the Complaint) (eop)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Randy L. Black. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USDC Judge Baverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Congressman Doug Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USDC Judge Pannell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown B.O.P. Agents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USDC Judge Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States District Court Judges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of B.O.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senator David Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senator Kelly Lafler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy L. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?