Westdale Asset Management et al v. Pryor et al
Plaintiff: Westdale Asset Management and PDQ Services, Inc.
Defendant: Gary Pryor and Rogena Peynado
Case Number: 1:2020cv03545
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 Case has been electronically remanded to Magistrate Court of Gwinnett County, Georgia. (rjs)
September 25, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to PDQ Services, Inc., Rogena Peynado, Gary Pryor re #7 Order. (rjs)
September 24, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (rjs)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER adopting #5 Final Report and Recommendation as the Opinion and Order of this Court. This civil action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Gwinnett County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/24/2020. (rjs)
September 23, 2020 Submission of #5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Rogena Peynado, Gary Pryor re #3 Notice (Other). (rjs)
September 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to PDQ Services, Inc., Rogena Peynado and Gary Pryor re #5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #6 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (rjs)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER (found in the #5 RR) granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 9/2/2020. (rjs)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Service of #5 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 9/2/2020. (rjs)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #4 Notice of Removal RECOMMENDING that the action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Gwinnett County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 9/2/2020. (rjs)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Gary Pryor, Rogena Peynado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 27, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (eop)
August 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Rogena Peynado and Gary Pryor re #2 Order. (eop)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Rogena Peynado and Gary Pryor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westdale Asset Management et al v. Pryor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westdale Asset Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PDQ Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogena Peynado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?