Blue Echo Care LLC v. Ackerman
Plaintiff: Blue Echo Care LLC doing business as Amazon Seller Blue Echo Care
Defendant: Christopher Ackerman
Case Number: 1:2020cv03586
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Christopher Ackerman. (adg)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE Of Filing Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Christopher Ackerman (jpa)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Manual Filing by Christopher Ackerman. (jpa)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Compliance by Christopher Ackerman re #6 Order (jpa)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 9/8/20. (rlb)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Blue Echo Care LLC. (Breloski, Jeffrey)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Christopher Ackerman. (eop)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Blue Echo Care LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10081630) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1, #2 Exhibit -2, #3 Exhibit -3, #4 Exhibit -4, #5 Exhibit -5, #6 Exhibit -6, #7 Exhibit -7, #8 Exhibit -8, #9 Exhibit -9, #10 Exhibit -10, #11 Exhibit -11, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Echo Care LLC v. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Echo Care LLC doing business as Amazon Seller Blue Echo Care
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Breloski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?