Johnson v. Paul et al
Plaintiff: Clarence D. Johnson, Jr.
Defendant: Joseph Walker, Religious Ethics Committee, Pope Francis Paul, Catholic Church, Chicago, IL, U. S. Attorneys Office and United Nations
Case Number: 1:2020cv03611
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 (construed by Clerk as) MOTION for Order, MOTION to Change Venue and MOTION for New Case Number by Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. (ah)
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb)
October 13, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. re #12 Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge. (ah)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying as moot #11 Motion for New Judge. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/13/2020. (ah)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for New Judge by Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. (jpa)
October 8, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. re #10 Clerk's Judgment. (ah)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (ah)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
October 5, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. re #9 Order. (ah)
October 5, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (ah)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: the Court hereby DISMISSES the complaint as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/5/20. (ah)
October 5, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. re #8 Notice (Other). (ah)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Hearing, MOTION for Extension of Time and MOTION to Seal Document. by Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. (ah)
September 4, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. re #3 Order. (rvb)
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. re #6 Order. (ah)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/3/2020. (ah)
September 2, 2020 Submission of #5 Complaint for frivolity review to District Judge William M. Ray II. (ah)
September 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. re #4 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Notice (Other). (ah)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT filed by Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to refrain from forwarding the Complaint to the United States Marshals Service for service until the District Judge orders otherwise. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the District Court for a frivolity. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 9/1/2020. (ah)
September 1, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop)
September 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. re #2 Order. (eop)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Clarence D. Johnson, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit -Envelope)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Paul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Religious Ethics Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pope Francis Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Church, Chicago, IL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Attorneys Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence D. Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?