Heavy Duty Lighting, LLC v. Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.
Plaintiff: Heavy Duty Lighting, LLC
Defendant: Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03648
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yungwirth, Matthew)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER granting in part and denying in part #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer deadline is extended to November 9th, 2020, only. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/30/2020. (pdw)
October 21, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc. answer due 11/2/2020. (rjs) Modified on 10/21/2020 (rjs).
October 20, 2020 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed by Heavy Duty Lighting, LLC. Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc. served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Burt, Jacqueline) Modified on 10/21/2020 to correct dates to match pleading filed (rjs).
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc. Answer due 11/2/2020. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/25/2020. (rjs)
September 25, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Jay P. Kesan re #15 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
September 25, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Cecil E. Key re #13 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jay P. Kesan. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/24/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Henning Schmidt. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/24/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Cecil E. Key. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/24/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yungwirth, Matthew)
September 11, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Jay P. Kesan Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Jay P. kesan added appearing on behalf of Heavy Duty Lighting, LLC (nmb)
September 11, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Henning Schmidt Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Henning Schmidt added appearing on behalf of Heavy Duty Lighting, LLC (nmb)
September 11, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Cecil E. Key Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Cecil E. Key added appearing on behalf of Heavy Duty Lighting, LLC (nmb)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Jay P. Kesan Pro Hac Vice.by Heavy Duty Lighting, LLC. (Burt, Jacqueline) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Henning Schmidt Pro Hac Vice.by Heavy Duty Lighting, LLC. (Burt, Jacqueline) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Cecil E. Key Pro Hac Vice.by Heavy Duty Lighting, LLC. (Burt, Jacqueline) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 9, 2020 RETURN of #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Jay P. Kesan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10110541). to attorney for correction re:Case number on application. (cdg)
September 9, 2020 RETURN of #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Henning Schmidt Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10110575). to attorney for correction re: Case number on application. (cdg)
September 9, 2020 RETURN of #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Cecil E. Key Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10110585). to attorney for correction re: Case number on application. (cdg)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Cecil E. Key Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10110585).by Heavy Duty Lighting, LLC. (Burt, Jacqueline) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Henning Schmidt Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10110575).by Heavy Duty Lighting, LLC. (Burt, Jacqueline) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Jay P. Kesan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10110541).by Heavy Duty Lighting, LLC. (Burt, Jacqueline) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.. (eop)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Heavy Duty Lighting, LLC. (eop)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Heavy Duty Lighting, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10101789) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Exhibit -F, #7 Exhibit -G, #8 Exhibit -H, #9 Exhibit -I, #10 Exhibit -J, #11 Exhibit -K, #12 Exhibit -L, #13 Exhibit -M, #14 Exhibit -N, #15 Exhibit -O, #16 Exhibit -P, #17 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heavy Duty Lighting, LLC v. Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Sean Yungwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heavy Duty Lighting, LLC
Represented By: Henning Schmidt
Represented By: Cecil E. Key
Represented By: Jacqueline Knapp Burt
Represented By: Jay P. Kesan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?