BRP Colleague Inc. et al v. Gillen et al
Plaintiff: BRP Colleague Inc. and Baldwin Krystyn Sherman Partners, LLC
Defendant: Edward (Teddy) Gillen and Edgewood Partners Insurance Center Inc. doing business as Epic Insurance Brokers & Consultants
Case Number: 1:2020cv03695
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Expedite Discovery, or to Require Defendants to Respond to this Motion in Five Days. Defendants are DIRECTED to respond to this Motion on the same schedule as Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Defendants shall file a Response Brief by 9:00 a.m. on Monday, September 21, 2020. If Plaintiffs are inclined to file a Reply Brief, their reply shall be due by 12:00 p.m.on Tuesday, September 22, 2020. Plaintiffs are further ORDERED to serve Defendants with a copy of this Order and their Motion to Expedite #9 at the same time they serve their other documents upon Defendants. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/11/2020. (kt)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing the parties to appear for a hearing on the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #8 on Wednesday, September 23, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2107. Plaintiffs are to serve Defendants with a copy of this Order, the Complaint, and the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #8 by Tuesday, September 15, 2020. Defendants are to file a Response Brief by 9:00 a.m. on Monday, September 21, 2020. If Plaintiffs are inclined to file a Reply Brief, their reply shall be due by 12:00 p.m. on Tuesday, September 22, 2020. The Court will contact the parties to determine if this hearing will be held in person or via videoconference. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/10/2020. (ddm)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, to Require Defendants to Respond to this Motion in Five Days with Brief In Support by BRP Colleague Inc., Baldwin Krystyn Sherman Partners, LLC. (Duffield, Todd)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by BRP Colleague Inc., Baldwin Krystyn Sherman Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Other Relief, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Gregg Schieffelbein)(Duffield, Todd)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BRP Colleague Inc., Baldwin Krystyn Sherman Partners, LLC. (Duffield, Todd)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/10/2020. (bnp)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Leigh Martin May for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-cv-03695-LMM. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 9/9/2020. (tcc)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Edgewood Partners Insurance Center Inc.. (eop)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Edward (Teddy) Gillen. (eop)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by BRP Colleague Inc. and Baldwin Krystyn Sherman Partners, LLC.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10112254) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRP Colleague Inc. et al v. Gillen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRP Colleague Inc.
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Jensen
Represented By: Todd Clifford Duffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baldwin Krystyn Sherman Partners, LLC
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Jensen
Represented By: Todd Clifford Duffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward (Teddy) Gillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgewood Partners Insurance Center Inc. doing business as Epic Insurance Brokers & Consultants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?