Bruce Ward v. Wells Fargo Auto et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Frederick Bruce Ward, Jr.
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc., Wells Fargo Auto, All Creditors and Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03704
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jonathan Frederick Bruce Ward Jr. re #8 Order, #9 Clerk's Judgment. Forward Time Exp RTN To Send. (tcc)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jonathan Frederick Bruce Ward Jr. re #6 Notice (Other). Return to Sender. Not Deliverable As Addressed. Unable to Forward. (tcc)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jonathan Frederick Bruce Ward, Jr. re #3 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (dob)
October 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jonathan Frederick Bruce Ward, Jr. re #8 Order and #9 Clerk's Judgment. (rjs)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (rjs)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
October 1, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (rjs)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's #4 Complaint and DIRECTS the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/1/2020. (rjs)
September 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jonathan Frederick Bruce Ward, Jr. re #6 Order. (rvb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 Mail sent to Jonathan Frederick Bruce Ward, Jr. re #2 Order Returned as Undeliverable. Marked: Return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. (jpk)
September 11, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jonathan Frederick Bruce Ward, Jr. regarding #5 Order. (mlb)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
September 10, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jonathan Frederick Bruce Ward, Jr. re #3 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (klb)
September 10, 2020 Submission of #4 Complaint, for a frivolity determination, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (klb)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jonathan Frederick Bruce Ward, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(klb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is further ORDERED that service of process shall not issue at this time. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this case to the District Court for a frivolity determination pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 9/10/20. (klb)
September 9, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (eop)
September 9, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jonathan Frederick Bruce Ward, Jr. re #2 Order. (eop)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Jonathan Frederick Bruce Ward, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce Ward v. Wells Fargo Auto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Auto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Creditors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Frederick Bruce Ward, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?