Progressive Lighting, Inc. v. Decor Selections, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Progressive Lighting, Inc. doing business as Savoy House or LightsOnline
Defendant: Larry Krayzman, Decor Selections, LLC and Lighting Commerce, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03840
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (jpk)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Katz, Seth)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, DIRECTING plaintiff to file the applicable AO Form pursuant to LR 3.4 within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 9/29/20. (hfm)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Progressive Lighting, Inc.. All Defendants. (Katz, Seth)
September 28, 2020 Submission of AO Form 120 - Notice to Parties, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (rlb)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 9/21/2020. (ddm)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court notes the Complaint contains a request for injunctive relief. Unless the Plaintiff files a separate motion for preliminary injunctive relief or temporary restraining order and supporting brief, consistent with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65, the Court will proceed on the premise that Plaintiff is only seeking injunctive relief in connection with any final judgment in this matter. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 9/18/20. (rlb)
September 17, 2020 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (rlb)
September 17, 2020 Submission of #1 Complaint regarding injunctive relief, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (rlb)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (rlb)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Decor Selections, LLC, Larry Krayzman and Lighting Commerce, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Krayzman, #2 Summons Lighting Commerce)(rlb)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10150700) filed by Progressive Lighting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Lighting, Inc. v. Decor Selections, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Lighting, Inc. doing business as Savoy House or LightsOnline
Represented By: Seth Nathan Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Krayzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decor Selections, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lighting Commerce, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?