West v. YRC Worldwide, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer West
Defendant: YRC Worldwide, Inc. and Darnell White
Case Number: 1:2020cv03849
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Referring Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE to Defendant YRC's Initial Disclosures by YRC Worldwide, Inc..(Willis, Amelia)
November 11, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend the Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support by Jennifer West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Amended Complaint)(Attwood, Eleanor)
November 11, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jennifer West. (Attwood, Eleanor)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's deadline to file her response re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM is extended through and including Wednesday, November 11, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 10/27/2020. (tcc)
October 23, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re: #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Jennifer West. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Attwood, Eleanor)
October 14, 2020 Notification of Docket Correction - changed to #10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement. (bdb)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jennifer West.(Attwood, Eleanor) Modified on 10/14/2020 to correct entry, originally filed under Initial Disclosures (bdb).
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Haeberle Krouse on behalf of YRC Worldwide, Inc. (Krouse, Katherine)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by YRC Worldwide, Inc. by YRC Worldwide, Inc..(Willis, Amelia)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by YRC Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Willis, Amelia)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Jennifer West. YRC Worldwide, Inc. served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Attwood, Eleanor) Modified on 10/5/2020 to accurately reflect e-filed pleading (tcc).
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (tcc)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Darnell White. (tcc)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to YRC Worldwide, Inc.. (tcc)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jennifer West. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10154425) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. YRC Worldwide, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Amelia M. Willis
Represented By: Katherine Haeberle Krouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darnell White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer West
Represented By: Eleanor Mixon Attwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?