CTSL LLC v. Blanket Homes, Inc.
Plaintiff: CTSL LLC
Defendant: Hilton Young and Blanket Homes, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03857
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Hilton Young re #8 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #9 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. Return to Sender. Not Deliverable As Addressed. Unable to Forward. (tcc)
October 21, 2020 Electronically Remanded back to State Court of Fulton County re #12 Amended Order. (bdb)
October 21, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Blanket Homes, Inc., Hilton Young re #12 Amended Order. (bdb)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED ORDER adopting #8 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: #11 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. Denying as moot #4 Motion to Remand to State Court. Sustaining #10 Motion to Modify which is construed as an objection. This matter is hereby REMANDED to the State Court of Fulton County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. This order has been amended to correct the case number only. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 10/21/2020. (bdb)
October 21, 2020 Electronically Remanded back to State Court of Fulton County re #11 Order. (bdb)
October 21, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (bdb)
October 21, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Blanket Homes, Inc., Hilton Young re #11 Order. (bdb)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER adopting #8 Final Report and Recommendation. Denying as moot #4 Motion to Remand to State Court. Sustaining #10 Motion to Modify which is construed as an objection. This matter is hereby REMANDED to the State Court of Fulton County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 10/21/2020. (bdb)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Adopt Modified Findings of #8 ORDER and FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (otherwise, Landlord has no objection to the Report)filed by CTSL LLC. (Aron, Stephanie)
October 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Blanket Homes, Inc., Hilton Young re #8 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #9 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (tcc)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Service of #8 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/1/2020. (tcc)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order (Contained w/in #8 Final R&R) ORDER GRANTING Defendant's IFP application [Doc. #1 ] for purposes of this action only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/1/2020. (tcc)
October 1, 2020 (Contained w/in #8 Final R&R) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court [Doc. #4 ] be DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/1/2020. (tcc)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that the action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/1/2020. (tcc)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Hilton Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Blanket Homes, Inc., Hilton Young re #6 Notice (Other). (tcc)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 -DOCKETED IN ERROR-SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop) Modified on 9/23/2020 (eop).
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by CTSL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Aron, Stephanie) . AddedMOTION for Attorney Fees on 9/22/2020 (tcc).
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 -DOCKETED IN ERROR-SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop) Modified on 9/22/2020 (eop).
September 21, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (eop)
September 21, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Blanket Homes, Inc. and Hilton Young re #2 Order. (eop)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Blanket Homes, Inc. and Hilton Young. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CTSL LLC v. Blanket Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CTSL LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Friese Aron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanket Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?