Gomez v. Bell et al
Plaintiff: Jaime Bernal Gomez
Defendant: Correct Solution C.C.S., Gwinnett County Jail, Sgt. R.L. Bell, L. Jackson and R.L. Butch Conway
Case Number: 1:2020cv03864
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Submission of #5 Order, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (dob)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the entry date of this Order, pay the $400.00 filing and administrative fees or properly execute and return an updated and current financial affidavit, using the form provided by the Clerk of Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must, within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the entry date of this Order, submit an amended complaint. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to RESUBMIT this action to the undersigned Magistrate Judge upon the expiration of the aforementioned time period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 9/30/2020. (dob)
September 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jaime Bernal Gomez re #5 Order with forms. (dob)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 29, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jaime Bernal Gomez re #4 Notice (Other). (dob)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Seventh Amendment to General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (jpk)
September 22, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jaime Bernal Gomez re #3 Order. (jpk)
September 22, 2020 Submission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (jpk)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Jaime Bernal Gomez. (jpk)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jaime Bernal Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Bell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Solution C.C.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwinnett County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. R.L. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.L. Butch Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Bernal Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?