Rogers v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Steven Rogers
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03865
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Filing From the Arizona MDL Docket: Master and Short Form Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Doc_303, #2 Doc_363, #3 Doc_364, #4 Doc_365, #5 Doc_366, #6 Doc_927, #7 Doc_1108, #8 Doc_1153-1, #9 Doc_1153-2, #10 Doc_1485)(dgs) (ADI)
September 21, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Filing From the Arizona MDL Docket: Miscellaneous Orders (dgs) (ADI)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Filing From the Arizona MDL Docket: Deposition Designation Orders (Attachments: #1 Doc_10403, #2 Doc_10438, #3 Doc_10486, #4 Doc_10497, #5 Doc_10524, #6 Doc_10922, #7 Doc_11064, #8 Doc_11073, #9 Doc_11080, #10 Doc_11313, #11 Doc_12357, #12 Doc_12508, #13 Doc_12590, #14 Doc_12595, #15 Doc_12598, #16 Doc_17386, #17 Doc_17513, #18 Doc_17582)(dgs) (ADI)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Filing From the Arizona MDL Docket: Motions in Limine Orders (Attachments: #1 Doc_9861, #2 Doc_9881, #3 Doc_10075, #4 Doc_10235, #5 Doc_10258, #6 Doc_10382, #7 Doc_10489, #8 Doc_10819, #9 Doc_10920, #10 Doc_10947, #11 Doc_11041, #12 Doc_11082, #13 Doc_11256, #14 Doc_12507, #15 Doc_12533, #16 Doc_17285, #17 Doc_17401)(dgs) (ADI)
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Filing From the Arizona MDL Docket: Daubert Orders (Attachments: #1 Doc_9432, #2 Doc_9433, #3 Doc_9434, #4 Doc_9770, #5 Doc_9771, #6 Doc_9772, #7 Doc_9773, #8 Doc_9991, #9 Doc_10051, #10 Doc_10052, #11 Doc_10072, #12 Doc_10230, #13 Doc_10231, #14 Doc_16992, #15 Doc_17285)(dgs) (ADI)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Filing From the Arizona MDL Docket: Discovery and Privilege Orders (Attachments: #1 Doc_699, #2 Doc_2813, #3 Doc_4865, #4 Doc_6799, #5 Doc_8813, #6 Doc_8315)(dgs) (ADI)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Filing From the Arizona MDL Docket: Discovery Orders (Attachments: #1 Doc_519, #2 Doc_1259, #3 Doc_1319, #4 Doc_1663, #5 Doc_2238, #6 Doc_2239, #7 Doc_3214, #8 Doc_3272, #9 Doc_3312, #10 Doc_3313, #11 Doc_3314, #12 Doc_3372, #13 Doc_3398, #14 Doc_3685, #15 Doc_4015, #16 Doc_4311, #17 Doc_4335, #18 Doc_4339, #19 Doc_4865, #20 Doc_4866, #21 Doc_5770, #22 Doc_5881, #23 Doc_5883, #24 Doc_6227, #25 Doc_6799)(dgs) (ADI)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Filing From the Arizona MDL Docket: Case Management Orders. (dgs) (ADI)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Filing From the Arizona MDL Docket: Bard MDL Docket (dgs) (ADI)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Filing From the Arizona MDL Docket: Stipulation of the Designation of Records on Remand or Transfer. (dgs) (ADI)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/01/2020. (aar)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-04083. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 17, 2020 Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Georgia via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/21/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER (FOURTH). That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the Clerk of this District is directed to transfer the cases listed on Schedule A to appropriate districts for further proceedings. See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/10/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/21/2020.]
November 6, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-4083-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/21/2020.]
November 6, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14833094 filed by Steven Rogers. (Attachment(s): #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 9/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Rogers
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?