Hagler v. Williams
Plaintiff: Alfred Hagler
Defendant: Tammy Rivera Williams and Tammy Rivera Malphurs
Case Number: 1:2020cv03873
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Tammy Rivera Williams. Discovery ends on 4/8/2021.(Graham, Charles) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Tammy Rivera Malphurs (Williams) by Alfred Hagler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ross, Tremaine)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Alfred Hagler. Tammy Rivera Williams served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Williams). (Ross, Tremaine)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/25/20. (bnw)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Tammy Rivera Williams. (eop)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Alfred Hagler. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10159439) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagler v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Rivera Williams
Represented By: Charles D. Graham
Represented By: E. Brian Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Rivera Malphurs
Represented By: Charles D. Graham
Represented By: E. Brian Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Hagler
Represented By: Tremaine Quindon Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?