The Progressive Southern Christian Leadership Conference et al v. Georgia Secretary of State et al
Plaintiff: The Progressive Southern Christian Leadership Conference and Dwayne Redding
Defendant: Georgia Secretary of State and The Executive Committee of the Georgia Democratic Party
Case Number: 1:2020cv03877
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dwayne Redding, The Progressive Southern Christian Leadership Conference re #9 Notice (Other). (jpa)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Emergency Injunction. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/23/20. (jpa)
September 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dwayne Redding, The Progressive Southern Christian Leadership Conference re #8 Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction. (jpa)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 Certified Mail Returned Receipt re #1 Complaint, served upon The Democratic Party of Georgia (kt)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Dwayne Redding. Georgia Secretary of State served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (kt)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/18/2020. (jta)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (jta)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Georgia Secretary of State, The Executive Committee of the Georgia Democratic Party. (jta)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Emergency Injunction by Dwayne Redding, The Progressive Southern Christian Leadership Conference. (jta)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT EMERGENCY INJUNCTION filed by The Progressive Southern Christian Leadership Conference, Dwayne Redding. (Filing fee $400, receipt number GAN100124194) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jta) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 18, 2020 Submission of #2 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (jta)
September 18, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dwayne Redding, The Progressive Southern Christian Leadership Conference re #5 Order. (jta)
September 18, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dwayne Redding, The Progressive Southern Christian Leadership Conference re #4 Order. (jta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Progressive Southern Christian Leadership Conference et al v. Georgia Secretary of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Progressive Southern Christian Leadership Conference
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Redding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Executive Committee of the Georgia Democratic Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?