Blue Star Kitchen, Inc. et al v. Manuel et al
Plaintiff: Blue Star Kitchen, Inc. a Georgia corporation doing business as UBAR and Alre Alston
Defendant: The Yu Bar & Grill, Inc. and Yumarcus C. Manuel
Case Number: 1:2020cv03886
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125a
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Yumarcus C. Manuel, The Yu Bar & Grill, Inc. Answer due 11/20/2020. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 10/27/2020. (tcc)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Yumarcus C. Manuel, The Yu Bar & Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pequignot, William)
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Yu Bar & Grill, Inc.. (tcc)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Alre Alston, Blue Star Kitchen, Inc. re The Yu Bar & Grill, Inc. (Maurer, Eric)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (tcc)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Yumarcus C. Manuel. (tcc)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Maurer, Eric)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Alre Alston, Blue Star Kitchen, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Maurer, Eric)
September 22, 2020 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Blue Star Kitchen, Inc. and Alre Alston. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10161033) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Incorrect Summons)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Star Kitchen, Inc. et al v. Manuel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Star Kitchen, Inc. a Georgia corporation doing business as UBAR
Represented By: Eric G. Maurer
Represented By: Andrea Nguyen Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alre Alston
Represented By: Eric G. Maurer
Represented By: Andrea Nguyen Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Yu Bar & Grill, Inc.
Represented By: William Andrew Pequignot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yumarcus C. Manuel
Represented By: William Andrew Pequignot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?