Wright v. IBM et al
Plaintiff: Darryl Wright
Defendant: Marriott Grande Vista, Orlando, FL, Aviation Inn, Isle of Verde Hampton Inn and Suites San Juan, Puerto Rico, Tropicana Casino Atlantic City, Outriggers Waikiki Beach Resort Honolulu, HI, Inner Harbor Baltimore Marriott Hotel, Capital Jazz Super Cruise Festival, La'Parilla Dallas Hwy Marietta, Ga, Nik's Restaurant, Marietta, GA, Dave & Buster's, Marietta, GA, Splash Condos Panama City Beach, Tidewater Condos Panama City Beach, BWI Sheraton Hotel, Ft Lauderdale Embassy Suites, Hyett Regency New Orleans, IBM, Sheraton Old San Juan Hotel, Sheraton Cancun Resort & Towers, Riazor Hotel Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic, The Grill bar and restaurant Austell, Ga, Doc's bar and restaurant, Taco Mac, Twin Peaks Kennesaw, GA, Marriott Renaissance Hotel San Domingo, Dominican Republic, MGM Grand Las Vegas, Pier Sixty-Six Hotel & Marina Hyatt, Ft Lauder, Palace Hotel San Francisco, Royal Lahaina, Maui, HI, Carnival Cruise Line, Dugan's Bar and Restaurant, LA Fitness Kennesaw, Ga, BWI Double Tree by Hilton, Associate Credit Union Dobbins Air Force Base, Four Points Sheraton Hotel Los Angeles, Marriott Woodland Hills, Ca., La Quinta Inn Homewood, AL, Atlanta North Druid Hills Hampton Inn Hotel, Sheraton Hotel Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic, BWI Embassy Suites Hotel and North Las Vegas, NV.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03928
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (ah) Modified to edit date on 11/3/2020 (ah).
October 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Darryl Wright re #22 Order on Motion to Dismiss. (ah)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this case. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/30/2020. (ah)
October 29, 2020 Submission of #21 Emergency MOTION to Dismiss, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (rlb)
October 29, 2020 Filing 21 Emergency Motion to Dismiss by Darryl Wright. (rlb)
October 29, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Michael O'Brien on behalf of Doc's bar and restaurant (O'Brien, Jay)
October 28, 2020 Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on October 13, 2020, before Judge William M. Ray II. Court Reporter, Wynette C. Blathers. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (wxb)
October 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Darryl Wright re #18 Order on Motion for Recusal. (ah)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #17 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/27/2020. (ah)
October 20, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Recusal by Darryl Wright. (Attachments: #1 Evidence)(ah)
October 13, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Darryl Wright re #16 Order on Motion for TRO,. (ah)
October 13, 2020 Submission of #7 MOTION For ECF Access, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (ah)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #2 Motion for TRO. The Court hereby orders the Plaintiff to file within twenty (20) days from the date of this Order a brief which states why the Court should not dismiss his Complaint. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/13/2020. (ah)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William M. Ray, II: The Court questioned Plaintiff about his request for a temporary restraining order against Defendants. After hearing from Plaintiff and Defendants, the Court DENIES the motion for TRO due to a lack of evidence. The Court will allow Plaintiff, within 20 days from today's date, to file a 25 page brief addressing why this Court has jurisdiction and why the claims would survive under Federal Rule 12. The Court will also allow Plaintiff to file an additional 25 page brief, within 20 days from today's date, as to whether or not the Court, if it dismisses this action, should sua sponte order that future lawsuits concerning these claims against these Defendants be subjected to a pre-screening restriction prior to filing. (Court Reporter Wynette Blathers)(ah)
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Finley on behalf of IBM (Finley, Joseph)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by William Augustus Todd on behalf of IBM (Todd, William)
October 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey John Costolnick on behalf of BWI Double Tree by Hilton (Costolnick, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David Paul Thatcher on behalf of BWI Double Tree by Hilton (Thatcher, David)
October 7, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of E-Mailing hearing invite to Darryl Wright re Notice. (jkl)
October 7, 2020 ZOOM INSTRUCTIONS re #9 Order Setting Hearing on Motion: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1600994903 Meeting ID: 160 099 4903 Passcode: 1705 Audio dial in: +1 646 828 7666. (jkl)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to BWI Double Tree by Hilton, Isle of Verde Hampton Inn and Suites San Juan, Puerto Rico, The Grill bar and restaurant Austell, Ga. (ah)
October 5, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Darryl Wright re #8 Notice (Other). (ah)
October 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Darryl Wright re #9 Order Setting Hearing on Motion. (ah)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING: Notice is hereby given that the Court sets a hearing to be conducted via ZOOM VIDEO on the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 in this case for Tuesday, October 13, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before the Honorable William M. Ray, II. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/1/2020. (ah)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BWI Sheraton Hotel. (jpk)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Four Points Sheraton Hotel Los Angeles. (jpk)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION For ECF Access by Darryl Wright. (ah)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (ah)
September 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Darryl Wright re #3 Order. (ah)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ah)
September 23, 2020 Submission of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (ah)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Darryl Wright. (ah)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with TRO request and Jury Demand filed by Darryl Wright (Filing fee $400, receipt number GAN100124262) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. IBM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Grande Vista, Orlando, FL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviation Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isle of Verde Hampton Inn and Suites San Juan, Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tropicana Casino Atlantic City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outriggers Waikiki Beach Resort Honolulu, HI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inner Harbor Baltimore Marriott Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Jazz Super Cruise Festival
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La'Parilla Dallas Hwy Marietta, Ga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nik's Restaurant, Marietta, GA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave & Buster's, Marietta, GA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Splash Condos Panama City Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tidewater Condos Panama City Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWI Sheraton Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ft Lauderdale Embassy Suites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyett Regency New Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBM
Represented By: Joseph E. Finley
Represented By: William Augustus Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheraton Old San Juan Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheraton Cancun Resort & Towers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riazor Hotel Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Grill bar and restaurant Austell, Ga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc's bar and restaurant
Represented By: Jay Michael O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Mac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Peaks Kennesaw, GA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Renaissance Hotel San Domingo, Dominican Republic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Grand Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pier Sixty-Six Hotel & Marina Hyatt, Ft Lauder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palace Hotel San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Lahaina, Maui, HI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Cruise Line
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dugan's Bar and Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Fitness Kennesaw, Ga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWI Double Tree by Hilton
Represented By: Jeffrey John Costolnick
Represented By: David Paul Thatcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Credit Union Dobbins Air Force Base
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Points Sheraton Hotel Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Woodland Hills, Ca.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Quinta Inn Homewood, AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlanta North Druid Hills Hampton Inn Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheraton Hotel Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWI Embassy Suites Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Las Vegas, NV.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?