Erpel v. U.S. Freedom Capital, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eric Erpel and Eric Drake
Defendant: Emily Tobolowsky, Allen Landerman PC, Dale Tillery, U.S. Freedom Capital, LLC, StoneGate Management, GP LLC, Russell & Wright PLLC, Adora 9 Operations, LLC, StoneGate Senior Living, LLC, Lee Reno, John Parker, Sam Cummings, Mark Pittman, Reed O'Connor, Ada Brown, Brantley Starr, James Hendrix, Hal R. Ray, David L. Horan, Matthew Kacsmaryk, Karen Scholer, John McBryde, Irma C. Ramirez, D.G. Bryant, Jr., James Edgar Kinkeade, Jeffrey Cureton, Rebecca Rutherford, Braxton Carter Thompson, Dallas County, David C. Godbey, Jane Boyle, Terry Means, Sam A. Lindsay, A. Joe Fish, R. Rutherford, Sidney A. Fitzwater and W. Johnson
Petitioner: Caroline Meredith
Case Number: 1:2020cv03935
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Garrett Moorman on behalf of Adora 9 Operations, LLC, U.S. Freedom Capital, LLC (Moorman, Christopher)
November 20, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY BRIEF re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Judge Emily Tobolowsky and Judge Dale Tillery's Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss filed by Dale Tillery, Emily Tobolowsky. (Merideth, Caroline)
November 16, 2020 Filing 30 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Eric Drake re #3 Motion Hearing Minutes returned via USPS. (ddm)
November 16, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE Of Filing Sealed Exhibit C (1 CD) to #28 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Eric Drake. (ddm) (ddm).
November 16, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Eric Drake. (Exhibit C filed Under Seal) (ddm)
November 16, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Judge Emily Tobolowsky and Judge Dale Tillery's Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss filed by Eric Drake. (ddm)
November 16, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default and Default Judgment against Defendants U.S. Freedom Capital, LLC and Adora 9 Operations, LLC filed by Eric Drake. (ddm)
November 16, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for the Court to Seize Plaintiff's Painting from Defendants StoneGate and Adora filed by Eric Drake. (ddm)
November 16, 2020 Filing 24 Objection to Attorney General of Georgia Involvement in the Litigation and MOTION to Strike filed by Eric Drake. (ddm)
November 16, 2020 Filing 23 Letter, dated November 16, 2020, to Judge Grimberg from Plaintiff. (ddm)
November 16, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of Address for Eric Drake. (ddm)
November 10, 2020 Submission of #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue MOTION to Transfer Case, #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Judge Emily Tobolowsky and Judge Dale Tillery's Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
November 5, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Judgment in First Amended Complaint filed by StoneGate Management, GP LLC. (Anderson, Carl)
November 5, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Judgment filed by Dale Tillery, Emily Tobolowsky. (Merideth, Caroline)
November 5, 2020 Submission of #1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Permanent Injunction, MOTION for Judgment to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
November 4, 2020 Filing 19 Mail sent to Eric Erpel, #3 NEF, returned not deliverable. Marked: Return to sender, insufficient address, unable to forward, attempted - unknown. (aaq)
November 2, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Substitution of Service by Eric Drake. (aaq)
November 2, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply and or otherwise Respond to Defendant's Motions filed by Eric Drake. (aaq)
October 27, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #7 Order (Anderson, Carl)
October 23, 2020 Filing 15 Mail sent to Eric Drake re #5 Notice (Other) Returned as Undeliverable. (rjs)
October 23, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons by StoneGate Management, GP LLC. (Anderson, Carl)
October 23, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer with Brief In Support by StoneGate Management, GP LLC. (Anderson, Carl) . Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 10/26/2020 (jed).
October 23, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction with Brief In Support by StoneGate Management, GP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John F. Taylor)(Anderson, Carl)
October 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eric Drake re #11 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jed)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Application of Caroline Meredith for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/23/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jed)
October 22, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Merideth, Caroline)
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Judge Emily Tobolowsky and Judge Dale Tillery's Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Dale Tillery, Emily Tobolowsky. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Merideth, Caroline)
October 22, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Caroline Meredith Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10277416). Attorney Caroline Alyssa Merideth added appearing on behalf of Dale Tillery, Emily Tobolowsky (cdg)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Caroline Meredith Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10277416).by Caroline Meredith. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Admission)(Naunas, Jason) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 14, 2020 Submission of #1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Judgment to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
October 7, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eric Drake re #3 Minutes on Hearing Order on Motion for TRO. (bdb)
October 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eric Drake re #5 Notice (Other). (bdb)
September 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eric Drake re #7 Order. (bdb)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/30/2020. (bdb)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Eric Drake against Adora 9 Operations, LLC, Allen Landerman PC, Jane Boyle, Ada Brown, D.G. Bryant, Jr., Sam Cummings, Jeffrey Cureton, Dallas County, A. Joe Fish, Sidney A. Fitzwater, David C. Godbey, James Hendrix, David L. Horan, W. Johnson, Matthew Kacsmaryk, James Edgar Kinkeade, Sam A. Lindsay, John McBryde, Terry Means, Reed O'Connor, John Parker, Mark Pittman, Irma C. Ramirez, Hal R. Ray, Lee Reno, Russell & Wright PLLC, R. Rutherford, Rebecca Rutherford, Karen Scholer, Brantley Starr, StoneGate Management, GP LLC, StoneGate Senior Living, LLC, Braxton Carter Thompson, Dale Tillery, Emily Tobolowsky, and U.S. Freedom Capital, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Eric Erpel. (Filing fee $400, receipt number GAN100124263) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steven D. Grimberg: Denying #1 Motion for TRO. Motion Hearing held on 9/23/2020 re #1 Plaintiff's Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Eric Erpel. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court DENIED the application. (Court Reporter Alicia Bagley)(bdb)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Adora 9 Operations, LLC, Allen Landerman PC, Russell & Wright PLLC, StoneGate Management, GP LLC, StoneGate Senior Living, LLC, Dale Tillery, Emily Tobolowsky, U.S. Freedom Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Adora9, #2 Summons Russell & Wright, #3 Summons U.S. Freedom Capital, #4 Summons StoneGate Management,, #5 Summons StoneGate Senior Living, #6 Summons Allen Landerman PC, #7 Summons Emily Tobolowsky)(rlb)
September 23, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: In Camera Hearing set for 9/23/2020 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1707 before Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (bdb)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 ORIGINAL PETITION EMERGENCY APPLICATION for Exparte Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED, Application for Temporary Injunction, for Permanent Injunction and REQUEST for Declaratory Judgment by Eric Erpel. Receipt for payment fee: $400.00 - GAN100124263. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erpel v. U.S. Freedom Capital, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Tobolowsky
Represented By: Caroline Alyssa Merideth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Landerman PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Tillery
Represented By: Caroline Alyssa Merideth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Freedom Capital, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Garrett Moorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: StoneGate Management, GP LLC
Represented By: Carl Hugo Anderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell & Wright PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adora 9 Operations, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Garrett Moorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: StoneGate Senior Living, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Reno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brantley Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hal R. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Horan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Kacsmaryk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Scholer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McBryde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irma C. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.G. Bryant, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Edgar Kinkeade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Cureton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Braxton Carter Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Godbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Means
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam A. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Joe Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney A. Fitzwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Erpel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Caroline Meredith
Represented By: Jason S. Naunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?