Rosen v. United Pool Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Barry W. Rosen
Defendant: Robert Legg and United Pool Management, Inc. doing business as USA Pool Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03971
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/2/2020. (ddm)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 28, 2020 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons. Read and approved by LMM. (bnp)
September 25, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Register of Copyrights re #5 A.O. Form 121 Copyright. (tmf)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (tmf)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (tmf)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Barry W. Rosen. (tmf)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Robert Legg, United Pool Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons United)(tmf)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Barry W. Rosen. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10186268) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosen v. United Pool Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Pool Management, Inc. doing business as USA Pool Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry W. Rosen
Represented By: Jason Aquilino
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?