Medline Industries, Inc. v. C.R. Bard, Inc.
Plaintiff: Medline Industries, Inc.
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03981
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED to seal the unredacted versions of: (1) Exhibits 2, 3, 4, 5 and 6 to the Motion to Stay or in the Alternative to Dismiss [Doc. #21 ]; and (2) the Memorandum of Law in Support of the Motion to Stay or in the Alternative to Dismiss. The documents shall remain under seal until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/29/2020. (tcc)
December 21, 2020 Submission of #23 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #22 , to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that:1.) Plaintiff's response to the #21 Motion to Stay or in the Alternative to Dismiss shall be filed on or before February 16, 2021. 2.) Defendant's reply brief in support of the #21 Motion to Stay or in the Alternative to Dismiss shall be filed on or before March 2, 2021. 3.) The 26(f) conference pursuant to L.R. 16.1 shall occur on or before February 19, 2021. 4.) The Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan shall be filed on or before March 5, 2021. 5.) The Initial Disclosures shall be served on or before March 5, 2021. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/16/20. (bnw)
December 11, 2020 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Briefing and Local Rule 16.1, 16.2, and 26.1(A) Deadlines re: #21 MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss by C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Metcalf, Janine)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (aaq) (ADI)
December 4, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE Of Filing refiling Exhibits A and B with corrected cover pages by C.R. Bard, Inc. re #23 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #22 Notice of Filing,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Protective Order in N.D. of Illinois case, #2 Exhibit B - Minute Order in N.D. of Illinois case)(Metcalf, Janine)
December 3, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #22 Notice of Filing,, with Brief In Support by C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Exhibit A - Protective Order entered in N.D. of Illinois case, #3 Exhibit B - Minute Order in N.D. of Illinois case, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Metcalf, Janine)
December 3, 2020 Filing 22 (SEALED PER #27 ORDER) NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay or in the Alternative Dismiss by C.R. Bard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief Unredacted Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Stay or in the Alternative to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition Testimony of Russell Riescher, #3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition Testimony of C. R. Bard's 30(b)(6) Witness, #4 Exhibit 4 - Corrected Expert Report of Barbara Weintraub, #5 Exhibit 5 - Expert Report of Dr. John Abraham, #6 Exhibit 6 - Final Motion to Enjoin with exhibits)(Metcalf, Janine) Modified on 12/29/2020 (tcc).
December 3, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative, MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Stay or in the Alternative to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 - Deposition Testimony of Elizabeth Hultman, #3 Exhibit 2 - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 5 - Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 6 - C. R. Bard Inc.s Motion to Enjoin Northern District of Georgia Action filed in Northern District of Illinois case)(Metcalf, Janine)
November 6, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #20 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew A. Traupman Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Matthew A. Traupman added appearing on behalf of C.R. Bard, Inc. (nmb)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #19 #20 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/6/20. (bnw)
November 3, 2020 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew A. Traupman Pro Hac Vice.by C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Metcalf, Janine) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 2, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Marc L Kaplan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10314097).. Attorney Marc L. Kaplan added appearing on behalf of C.R. Bard, Inc. (nmb)
November 2, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven C Cherny Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10314148).. Attorney Steven C. Cherny added appearing on behalf of C.R. Bard, Inc. (nmb)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/2/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/2/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
November 2, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #19 APPLICATION for Admission of Nicole Smith Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10324611).. Attorney Nicole M. Smith added appearing on behalf of C.R. Bard, Inc. (nmb)
October 30, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Nicole Smith Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10324611).by C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Metcalf, Janine) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 29, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Athena Dalton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10314160).. Attorney Athena Dalton added appearing on behalf of C.R. Bard, Inc. (cdg)
October 29, 2020 RETURN of #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew A Traupman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10314134). to attorney for correction re: Courts. (cdg)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/29/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
October 28, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Athena Dalton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10314160).by C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Metcalf, Janine) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 28, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven C Cherny Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10314148).by C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Metcalf, Janine) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 28, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew A Traupman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10314134).by C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Metcalf, Janine) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 28, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Marc L Kaplan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10314097).by C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Metcalf, Janine) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. C.R. Bard, Inc. Answer due 12/3/2020. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/16/20. (bnw)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by C.R. Bard, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Metcalf, Janine)
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Complaint, by C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Metcalf, Janine)
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Janine Cone Metcalf on behalf of C.R. Bard, Inc. (Metcalf, Janine)
October 1, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephanie P. Koh Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10192640). Attorney Stephanie P. Koh added appearing on behalf of Medline Industries, Inc. (cdg)
October 1, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas D. Rein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10192660). Attorney Thomas D. Rein added appearing on behalf of Medline Industries, Inc. (cdg)
October 1, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Courtney Eilzabeth Cronin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10192623). Attorney Courtney Elizabeth Cronin added appearing on behalf of Medline Industries, Inc. (cdg)
October 1, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Nathaniel C. Love Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10192634). Attorney Nathaniel C. Love added appearing on behalf of Medline Industries, Inc. (cdg)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 #7 #8 #9 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/1/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Medline Industries, Inc.. C.R. Bard, Inc. served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Kent, Daniel)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas D. Rein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10192660).by Medline Industries, Inc.. (Kent, Daniel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephanie P. Koh Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10192640).by Medline Industries, Inc.. (Kent, Daniel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Nathaniel C. Love Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10192634).by Medline Industries, Inc.. (Kent, Daniel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Courtney Eilzabeth Cronin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10192623).by Medline Industries, Inc.. (Kent, Daniel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Seventh Amendment to General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/01/2020. (rvb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (rvb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Medline Industries, Inc. (rvb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to C.R. Bard, Inc. (rvb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Medline Industries, Inc.(Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10187538) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medline Industries, Inc. v. C.R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medline Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Kent
Represented By: Nathaniel C. Love
Represented By: Thomas D. Rein
Represented By: Stephanie P. Koh
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole M. Smith
Represented By: Marc L. Kaplan
Represented By: Matthew A. Traupman
Represented By: Steven C. Cherny
Represented By: Janine Cone Metcalf
Represented By: Athena Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?