Ritson v. Ruby Tuesday Inc
Plaintiff: Marty Ritson
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03998
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 19 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Steve Smith. Clerk to follow-up by 11/9/2020. (nmb)
October 29, 2020 Filing 18 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Mark L. Johansen. Clerk to follow-up by 11/9/2020. (nmb)
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Ruby Tuesday, Inc. re #16 Suggestion of Bankruptcy Supplemental Certificate of Service (Gregory, Lauren)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Gregory, Lauren)
October 2, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #13 Order (Gregory, Lauren)
October 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren M. Gregory on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (Gregory, Lauren)
September 29, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ruby Tuesday, Inc. re #13 Order to: John D. Bosco. (bdb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/29/2020. (bdb)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/20. (aar)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-01848. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AGREED ORDER ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE: The Court GRANTS the Motion to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, to Transfer in part and transfers the case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 9/28/2020) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/28/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Ruby Tuesday Inc re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B) (Bosco, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/28/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by Ruby Tuesday Inc Attorney John D Bosco added to party Ruby Tuesday Inc(pty:dft) (Bosco, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/28/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ruby Tuesday Inc, served on 8/4/2020. (Smith, Steve) Modified text on 8/7/2020 (mla). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/28/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Marty Ritson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Smith, Steve) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/28/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marty Ritson. (Smith, Steve) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/28/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: No later than 21 days from the date of this order, Plaintiff must file an amended complaint that alleges diversity of citizenship in conformity with 28 U.S.C. 1332; otherwise, this action will be dismissed without prejudice for want of jurisdiction. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 7/14/2020) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/28/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ruby Tuesday Inc. (hml) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/28/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/28/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Marty Ritson. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10991087) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Smith, Steve) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/28/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ritson v. Ruby Tuesday Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Bosco
Represented By: Lauren M. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marty Ritson
Represented By: Steve Smith
Represented By: Mark L. Johansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?