Kaur v. YRC Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Baljeet Kaur
Defendant: YRC Worldwide, Inc., Paul Gehrsitz, John Doe Individual(s), YRC Enterprise Services, Inc., Old Republic Insurance Co., YRC Inc. doing business as YRC Freight and John Doe Entity(ies)
Case Number: 1:2020cv04075
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement (Partial) by Baljeet Kaur (McGahren, Matthew)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by YRC Enterprise Services, Inc. and YRC Worldwide, Inc.. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Paul Gehrsitz, Old Republic Insurance Co. and YRC Inc.. Discovery ends on 3/1/2021. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by YRC Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-10218770) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 -Complaint, #2 Exhibit -2 -Answer -1, #3 Exhibit -3 -Answer -2, #4 Exhibit -4 -O.C.G.A. 51-12-14 Unliquidated Damages..., #5 Exhibit -5 -Email Correspondence June 1, 2020; June 5, 2020, #6 Exhibit -6 -Plaintiffs Responses to Defendant YRC, Inc. -First Continuing Interrogatories, #7 Exhibit -7 -Plaintiffs Responses to Defendant YRC, Inc. -First Request for Production, #8 Exhibit -8 -Plaintiffs Responses to First Requests for Admission, #9 Exhibit -9 -Plaintiffs Original Responses, #10 Exhibit -10 -Plaintiffs Supplemental Response, #11 Affidavit of E. E. Smith, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaur v. YRC Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Michael David Hostetter
Represented By: Evan E Smith, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Gehrsitz
Represented By: Michael David Hostetter
Represented By: Evan E Smith, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Individual(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Enterprise Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael David Hostetter
Represented By: Evan E Smith, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Co.
Represented By: Michael David Hostetter
Represented By: Evan E Smith, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Inc. doing business as YRC Freight
Represented By: Michael David Hostetter
Represented By: Evan E Smith, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Entity(ies)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baljeet Kaur
Represented By: Eric John Marlett
Represented By: Matthew Francis McGahren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?