Phelps v. Deutsche Telekom
Plaintiff: Ellis Eugene Phelps
Defendant: Deutsche Telekom doing business as T-Mobile USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04102
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Cooper, Jennifer)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default by Deutsche Telekom. (rjs)
October 7, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Ellis Eugene Phelps. Deutsche Telekom served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. (ah)
October 6, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Deutsche Telekom re #3 Order. (eop)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Deutsche Telekom. (eop)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ellis Eugene Phelps. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number GAN100124486) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phelps v. Deutsche Telekom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Telekom doing business as T-Mobile USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellis Eugene Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?