Cole v. Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shameka Cole
Defendant: John Does 1-4, Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC, John Does 2-4 and Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04179
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #9 Order (McKinley, John)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on October 14, 2020. (ash)
October 13, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC re #8 Order. (Sent to Attorney Daniel S. Wolcott) (eop)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC..(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC. (eop)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC and John Does 2-4 with Jury Demand filed by Shameka Cole. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER from State Court of Gwinnett County: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. shall be dropped from the case without prejudice and that Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC shall be added as a party defendant and that the style of the case shall so reflect. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop) Modified on 10/13/2020 (eop).
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss defendant Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. and add Chipotle Grill of Colorado, LLC as a Party Defendant by Shameka Cole. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. Discovery ends on 3/8/2021. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-10245668) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 -Summons, #2 Exhibit -2 -Complaint, #3 Exhibit -3 -Rule 5-2 Certificate, #4 Exhibit -4 -Plaintiff's RFAs to Defendant, #5 Exhibit -5 -Plaintiff's RPDs to Defendant, #6 Exhibit -6 -Plaintiff's ROGs to Defendant, #7 Exhibit -7 -Affidavit of Service, #8 Exhibit -8 -Rule 5.2 re NPRPDs, #9 Exhibit -9 -Answer of Chipotle, #10 Exhibit -10 -Rule 5.2 re Chipotle's response to RFAs, #11 Exhibit -11 -Consent Motion, #12 Exhibit -12 -Order, #13 Exhibit -13 -Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint, #14 Exhibit -14 -Rule 5.2 re Plaintiff's 1st RPDs, ROGS & RFAs to Dft, #15 Exhibit -15 -Plaintiff's 1st RFAs to Dft, #16 Exhibit -16 -Plaintiff's 1st RPDs to Dft, #17 Exhibit -17 -Pltf's 1st ROGs to Dft, #18 Exhibit -18 -Certificate of Service of Pltf's Offer of Settlement, #19 Exhibit -19 Acknowledgement of Service of Process -, #20 Exhibit -20 -Notice to State Court, #21 Exhibit -Certification of NOR, #22 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Wolcott
Represented By: John Lowell McKinley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 2-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Wolcott
Represented By: John Lowell McKinley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shameka Cole
Represented By: Andrew Lee Hagenbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?