Ofili v. Melendez et al
Plaintiff: William Ofili
Defendant: Juan Melendez, Prime Insurance Company and SDM Transport Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04190
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING within ten (10) days of the date of this Order why this case should not be remanded to the State Court of Fulton County. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/14/2020. (tcc)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/13/2020. (tcc)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Juan Melendez, Prime Insurance Company and SDM Transport Inc. with Jury Demand filed by William Ofili. (Filed in State Court on 10/7/20)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Omitted Document from Exhibit by Juan Melendez, Prime Insurance Company, SDM Transport Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Amended Complaint)(Brahmbhatt, Sheetal)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Juan Melendez and SDM Transport Inc..(Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Prime Insurance Company. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Juan Melendez and SDM Transport Inc.. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal #1 Ex-A) (eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Prime Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 3/8/2021. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 -DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR -AFFIDAVIT- (eop) Modified on 10/13/2020 (eop).
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Prime Insurance Company, Juan Melendez and SDM Transport Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-10246461) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ofili v. Melendez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ofili
Represented By: Benjamin Clary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Melendez
Represented By: Shawn N. Kalfus
Represented By: Sheetal M. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Matthew Peter Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Insurance Company
Represented By: Shawn N. Kalfus
Represented By: Sheetal M. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Matthew Peter Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDM Transport Inc.
Represented By: Shawn N. Kalfus
Represented By: Sheetal M. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Matthew Peter Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?