Georgia Voter Alliance et al v. Fulton County
Plaintiff: John Wood and Georgia Voter Alliance
Defendant: Fulton County
Case Number: 1:2020cv04198
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (tmf)
November 5, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (tmf)
November 4, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) filed by Georgia Voter Alliance, John Wood (Kaardal, Erick)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Plaintiffs Georgia Voter Alliance and John Wood's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #3 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/28/2020. (tmf)
October 27, 2020 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leigh Martin May: Motion Hearing held on 10/27/2020 re #3 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED filed by John Wood, Georgia Voter Alliance. #3 Motion for TRO TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. The Court held a hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court heard from Plaintiffs' and Defendant's counsel. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter Montrell Vann)(tmf)
October 26, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED filed by Georgia Voter Alliance, John Wood. (Kaardal, Erick)
October 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Lowman on behalf of Fulton County (Lowman, David)
October 23, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Detriss Thomas on behalf of Fulton County (Thomas, Detriss)
October 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaye Woodard Burwell on behalf of Fulton County (Burwell, Kaye)
October 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl Ringer on behalf of Fulton County (Ringer, Cheryl)
October 23, 2020 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING re: #3 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2020 at 01:00 PM via Zoom before Judge Leigh Martin May. Connection Instructions: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1601930855 Webinar ID: 160 193 0855 Passcode: 123456 You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (bnp)
October 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Erick Gregg Kaardal on behalf of Georgia Voter Alliance, John Wood (Kaardal, Erick)
October 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Fulton County. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Linkous, William)
October 21, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED filed by Fulton County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Election Integrity Order, #2 Exhibit B - Wisconsin Voters Alliance Order, #3 Exhibit C - Minnesota Voters Alliance Order, #4 Exhibit D - Texas Voters Alliance Order, #5 Exhibit E - Iowa Voter Alliance Order, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Richard Barron, #7 Exhibit G - Resolution Authorizing Grant)(Linkous, William)
October 16, 2020 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 10/16/2020 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission of Erick Gregg Kaardal Pro Hac Vice. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/16/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnp)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Georgia Voter Alliance, John Wood. All Defendants. (Hirsh, Michael)
October 15, 2020 Clerks Approval re #4 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
October 15, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Erick Gregg Kaardal Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10256338).. Attorney Erick Gregg Kaardal added appearing on behalf of Georgia Voter Alliance, John Wood (cdg)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/14/2020. (tmf)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case comes before the Court on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #3 . The Court ORDERS the parties to appear for a hearing on the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #3 on Tuesday, October 27, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2107 in the Richard Russell Federal Building, 75 Ted Turner Dr. SW, Atlanta, GA 30303. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to serve Defendant with a copy of this Order, the Complaint, and the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #3 by Thursday, October 15, 2020. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(e), (h). Plaintiff should file proof of service on the docket once Defendants have been served with this Order and the pleadings. Defendants are DIRECTED to file a Response Brief by 9:00 a.m. on Thursday, October 22, 2020. If for some reason Defendants are unable to comply with this Order, they should alert Ms. Poley as soon as possible ((404) 215-1514). If Plaintiffs are inclined to file a Reply Brief, their reply shall be due by 12:00 p.m. on Monday, October 26, 2020. The Court will contact the parties to determine if this hearing will be held in person or via video conference. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/13/2020. (tmf)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Erick Gregg Kaardal Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10256338).by Georgia Voter Alliance, John Wood. (Hirsh, Michael) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-10246959. (Hirsh, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED with Brief In Support by Georgia Voter Alliance, John Wood. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit 1st Declaration of E. Kaardal, #2 Affidavit 2nd Declartion of E. Kaardal, #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion for TRO, #4 Exhibit Exhibits A-F in Support of TRO, #5 Exhibit Exhibit G in Support of TRO, #6 Exhibit Exhibit H in support of TRO, #7 Exhibit Exhibit I in support of TRO, #8 Notice of Hearing on TRO, #9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on TRO)(Hirsh, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (tmf)
October 13, 2020 Submission of #1 Complaint,, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Georgia Voter Alliance, John Wood. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10247023) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgia Voter Alliance et al v. Fulton County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wood
Represented By: Erick Gregg Kaardal
Represented By: Michael Ross Hirsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Voter Alliance
Represented By: Erick Gregg Kaardal
Represented By: Michael Ross Hirsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton County
Represented By: William J. Linkous, III
Represented By: Detriss Thomas
Represented By: Cheryl Ringer
Represented By: Kaye Woodard Burwell
Represented By: David R. Lowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?