Martin v. Hauser, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cameron Martin
Defendant: Hauser, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04223
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/24/2020. (bgt)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Cameron Martin. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A - TRO Transcript, #3 Exhibit B - 10/10/20 Ltr, #4 Exhibit C - Sparks v McGriff, #5 Exhibit D - Sonderman v McGriff, #6 Exhibit E - Clayton v Americhem)(Roberts, David)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (jta)
October 15, 2020 Submission of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jta)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of James Stines re #1 Notice of Removal. (jta)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 REPLY to Response to Motion (filed in the Georgia State-Wide Business Court) re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Cameron Martin. (jta)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 RESPONSE in Opposition (filed in the Georgia State-Wide Business Court) re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Hauser, Inc.. (jta)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (filed in The Georgia State-Wide Business Court) IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED with Brief In Support by Cameron Martin. (jta)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-10256079) filed by Hauser, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-L, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jta) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Hauser, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hauser, Inc.
Represented By: Tucker C. Motta
Represented By: Jessica Burns
Represented By: Matthew T. Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Martin
Represented By: David Allen Roberts
Represented By: Brian Scott Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?