Allen v. Solo et al
Plaintiff: Eric Allen
Defendant: Lydia Solo and Jefferson Solo
Case Number: 1:2020cv04236
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 Remand letter, certified copy of order, and docket sheet mailed to Gwinnett County Magistrate Court.(jed)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 Case Electronically Remanded to Gwinnett County Magistrate Court per #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. Status: Submitted. Rejected on 12/1/2020. Directed to mail in. (jed) Modified on 12/2/2020 (jed).
December 1, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (jed)
December 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jefferson Solo, Lydia Solo re #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (jed)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #4 Final Report and Recommendation and DIRECTING that this case be remanded to the Magistrate Court of Gwinnett County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 12/1/2020. (jed)
December 1, 2020 Docket reviewed by SDG. No conflict. (ash)
November 2, 2020 Submission of #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
October 15, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jefferson Solo and Lydia Solo re Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, and #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (jed)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 10/15/2020 within the #4 R&R. (jed)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 10/15/2020. (jed)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal RECOMMENDING this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Gwinnett County. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 10/15/2020. (jed)
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF ACTION filed by Jefferson Solo. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal w/ Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used- forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 15, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (eop)
October 15, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jefferson Solo and Lydia Solo re #2 Order. (eop)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Jefferson Solo. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Solo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lydia Solo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Solo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?